Payne v. Mule Creek State, et al

Plaintiff: Mark Payne
Defendant: Brett Williams, Troy Brimhall, Christopher Smith, Merle Sogge and D. Williams
Case Number: 2:2004cv01585
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/25/10 recommending that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/14/10 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/10 ORDERING that the stay imposed in this action on 12/2/08 is LIFTED; Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel 102 is DENIED; and the 5/30/08 scheduling order is amended as follows: The parties may conduct discovery until 4/6/10; All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 6/6/10. (Dillon, M)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2009; pltf shall inform Court of proceeding with action or requesting stay; Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE pltf's counsel, Attorney Michael Newdow, and reinstate pltf as pro se. (Suttles, J)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATUS REPORT re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/5/09; the 10/7/09 settlement conference is VACATED; the reference to Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison has expired and this case is REMOVED from the Prison Mediation Program.(Yin, K)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/3/09 ORDERING that this case is set for mediation on 10/7/09, at 9:00 a.m. at HDSP, Rice Canyon Road, Susanville, California. Parties are directed to provide confidential settlement conference statements to Magistrate Judge Kellison, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814, so that they arrive no later than 9/30/09. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Sujean Younger, the courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Coordinator.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Mule Creek State, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Williams
Represented By: James Edmund Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Brimhall
Represented By: James Edmund Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Represented By: James Edmund Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Sogge
Represented By: James Edmund Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williams
Represented By: James Edmund Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?