Valley v. Woodford et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv00310
Filed: February 16, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/13/2010 ORDERING 121 Warden-PBSP to produce inmate Charles Edward Valley, #K-58889, to appear in proceedings at USDC EDCA, Sacramento CA, Courtroom #14 on 6/7/2010 at 9:00 AM. FURTHER You have been ORDERED to notify the court of any change in custody of the inmate and have been ORDERED to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: Warden-PBSP, Out-to-Court Desk, USM) (Reader, L)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/25/10 ordering defendants' motion for leave to file a supplemental motion for summary judgment 110 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to re-schedule a trial date 112 is granted. Tr ial is set to commence in courtroom 7 before U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England on 06/07/10 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants shall submit pretrial statements no later than 30 days after the entry of this order. Plaintiff's motion in limine 103 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 102 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/15/10. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?