Ketchum et al v. City of Vallejo
Plaintiff: Wynathen Ketchum and Ana Menjivar
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Not Yet Classified: VDRP
Case Number: 2:2005cv01098
Filed: June 1, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: John F Moulds
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2009 Filing 124 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE Attorney Alan M. Cohen for City of Vallejo, attorney Claudia M. Quintana terminated (Cohen, Alan) Modified on 2/5/2009 (Reader, L).
August 20, 2008 Filing 123 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Claudia M Quintana for City of Vallejo (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 8/21/2008 (Manzer, C).
August 14, 2008 Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER: In view of the notice of stay entered on May 28, 2008, the court vacates all pending dates in this matter. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H)
May 28, 2008 Filing 121 NOTICE of Automatic Stay by City of Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones-Martin, Alesia)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Chief Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Due to the recent appointment of Judge John A. Mendez to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Judge Ralph R. Beistline to Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
March 27, 2008 [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] COMPLETION of VDRP, terminating VDRP party. This case has completed the VDRP process. Case did not settle.(Martinez, L)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/10/07 GRANTING plaintiff's #108 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION and DENYING defendants #109 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION. It is hereby ordered that section II.B of this courts #107 Order is modified to reflect that Menjivars action was properly commenced on 4/11/2007, and Ketchums action was properly commenced on 5/9/2007. It is further ordered that Menjivar can recover damages for any violation of the FLSA accruing within either the two-year period from 4/11/2005, to 4/11/2007, or if Defendants violation of the FLSA is found to be willful the three-year period from 4/11/2004, to 4/11/2007. It is further ordered that Ketchum can recover damages for any violation of the FLSA accruing within either the two-year period from 5/9/2005, to 5/9/2007, or if Defendants violation of the FLSA is found to be willful the three-year period from 5/9/2004, to 5/9/2007. (Anderson, J)
November 29, 2007 Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for December 5, 2007 are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 78-230 (h).If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be setand the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ONLY) (Vine, H)
November 28, 2007 Filing 117 REPLY to RESPONSE to #108 MOTION for Reconsideration (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 11/29/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 28, 2007 Filing 116 REPLY to RESPONSE to #109 MOTION for Reconsideration (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/29/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 28, 2007 Filing 115 NOTICE of Lodging of Authorities in Support of Motion for Reconsideration/Clarification of Court's Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment, and/or Motion to Strike by City of Vallejo.(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/29/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 28, 2007 Filing 114 [DISREGARD see document #116 for correct image] REPLY to RESPONSE to MOTION. /Defendant City of Vallejo's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration/Clarification of Court's Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/29/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 21, 2007 Filing 113 OBJECTIONS to Evidence in Support of Opposition to D's #108 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar.(Mastagni, David) Modified on 11/26/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 21, 2007 Filing 112 RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to Defendant's #108 Motion for Reconsideration (Mastagni, David) Modified on 11/26/2007 (Anderson, J).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER, re docket no. #110 , resetting hearing dates, signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/31/07. The VDRP new DDL will be within 60 days of filing of the Order on the Motions for Reconsideration. Trial is RESET from 1/14/08 to 10/6/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (RRB) before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. Pretrial Conference is RESET from 12/14/07 to 8/22/08 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (RRB) before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. (Kastilahn, A)
October 31, 2007 Filing 110 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by parties to modify Scheduling Order regarding Trial, Pretrial Conference, and VDRP Deadlines. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/1/2007 (Marciel, M).
October 25, 2007 Filing 109 AMENDED MOTION for RECONSIDERATION of order #107 by of defendants; Hearing set for 12/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Defendants Motion for Reconsideration)(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 10/26/2007 (Becknal, R).
October 19, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar.Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (RRB) before Judge Ralph R. Beistline. (Attachments: #(1) Points and Authorities, #(2) Declaration of Will M. Yamada, #(3) Request for Judicial Notice)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 10/23/2007 (Kastilahn, A).
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/12/07 ORDERING that dft's amended motion for summary judgment #62 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Dft's motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks a determination that the instant action has not been properly commenced. It is DENIED in all other respects. Pltfs' cross-moiton for summary adjudication #58 is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks a determination that the time spent training and transporting MPU horses is compensable work under the FLSA. (Kastilahn, A)
August 2, 2007 Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for August 8, 2007 are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 78-230 (h).If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 12, 2007 Filing 105 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an order to Modify Deadline to Complete VDRP by City of Vallejo for Order and Proposed Order (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/13/2007 (Duong, D).
July 12, 2007 MINUTE ORDER: re #105 GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the unopposed Ex Parte Application to continue the VDRP session is approved. (TEXT ONLY) (Vine, H)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Chief Judge David F. Levi; Due to the Order of Designation of Judge Ralph R. Beistline to serve in the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Judge David F. Levi to Judge Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
June 11, 2007 Filing 103 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by City of Vallejo. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 6/12/2007 (Manzer, C).
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION and ORDER re #101 modifying the scheduling order, signed by Judge David F. Levi on 6/6/07. The Jury Trial is hereby RESET from 10/22/07 to 1/14/08 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 ( ) before Chief Judge David F. Levi; and the Pretrial Conference is RESET from 9/14/07 to 12/14/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 ( ) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Kastilahn, A)
June 6, 2007 Filing 101 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Trial and Pretrial Conference; Proposed Order Regarding Same by City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
May 21, 2007 Filing 100 NOTICE by Wynathen Ketchum. Consent to Be Included As a Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
May 17, 2007 MINUTE ORDER: re #58 Motion for Summary Judgment,, #62 Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion hearing reset for 8/8/2007 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial reset for 10/22/2007 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. Pretrial Conference reset for 9/14/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. The parties joint pretrial statement shall be filed on or before 9/7/2007. (TEXT ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 9, 2007 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar re #98 Amended Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/11/2007 (Reader, L).
May 9, 2007 Filing 98 AMENDED RESPONSE to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts re #62 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication. (Attachments: #1 Amended Statement of Undisputed Facts #2 Amended Declaration of Will M. Yamada #3 Exhibit A #4 Exhibit H #5 Exhibit P)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/11/2007 (Reader, L).
April 25, 2007 Filing 97 AMENDED STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts and DECLARATION by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar re #58 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 Exhibit A-G #3 Exhibit H-K #4 Proof of Service)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 4/26/2007 (Donati, J).
April 20, 2007 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION. To Defendant's Objections and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Will Yamada #2 Exhibit Part I#3 Exhibit Part II)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Reader, L).
April 20, 2007 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on motion(s) now set for April 25, 2007 are ordered reset to Wednesday, May 23, 2007 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom #7. (TEXT ONLY)(Vine, H)
April 19, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE OF ERRATA by City of Vallejo. to Def's Opposition, Response to Plaintiffs' Stmt of UMFs ISO Def's Opp to Plfs' Motion for Summary Adjudication (Attachments: #1 Amended Opp to Pltfs' Motion for Summary Adjudication#2 Def's Amended Response to Pltfs' Stmt of UMFs ISO Plfs' MSA)(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Reader, L).
April 19, 2007 Filing 94 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #58 Motion for Summary Judgment. of errors contained in the Decl of David E. Mastagni, and Statement of Undisputed Facts (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Reader, L).
April 18, 2007 Filing 93 REPLY to RESPONSE to MOTION. Opp to Mot to Strike (Yamada, Willy)
April 18, 2007 Filing 92 REPLY to RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Reader, L).
April 18, 2007 Filing 91 REPLY to RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication (Attachments: #1 Def's Reply to Plfs' Stmt of UMFs ISO#2 Def's Reply to Plfs' Response to Def's Separate Stmt of Undisputed Facts#3 Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Will M. Yamada, Exhibits, and Decls Attached Thereto)(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Reader, L).
April 17, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE OF ERRATA by all plaintiffs re #84 Opposition. With Exhibits (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Reader, L).
April 13, 2007 Filing 89 NOTICE OF ERRATA by all plaintiffs re #84 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Will Yamada With Exhibits)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/16/2007 (Reader, L).
April 12, 2007 Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING / LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by City of Vallejo: Deposition Transcript of Rod Bergen w/exhibits 1-6, Lodged with court pursuant to 56-260(e) and 5-133(j). (Received on 4/12/07 and Routed to fileroom) (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Donati, J).
April 11, 2007 Filing 87 DECLARATION of WILL M. YAMADA in SUPPORT re #84 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D#2 Exhibit E - I#3 Exhibit J - O#4 Exhibit P - R#5 Exhibit S - Z#6 Exhibit AA - AC)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Reader, L).
April 11, 2007 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts #67 by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar re #84 Opposition. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Reader, L).
April 11, 2007 Filing 85 STATEMENT of UNDISPUTED FACTS in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Plaintiffs Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar re #84 . (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Reader, L).
April 11, 2007 Filing 84 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar to Motion for Summary Judgment #62 (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Reader, L).
April 11, 2007 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John R. Whitefleet in Support of Opp to MSJ/SA#2 Response to Plfs' Stmt of UMFs ISO Plfs' SA#3 Objections and Motion to Strike Decl of D. Mastagni/Exhibits & Decls Attached Thereto)(Whitefleet, John)
April 11, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE OF FILING / LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER Courtesy copies of deposition transcripts cited in support of opposition by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar: Deposition Transcripts Lodged with court pursuant to 5-133(j). (Received on 4/12/07 and Routed to fileroom) (Mastagni, David) Modified on 4/12/2007 (Donati, J).
March 23, 2007 Filing 81 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER Courtesy copies of Deposition Transcripts cited in SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar: Deposition Transcripts Lodged with court pursuant to 5-133. [TRANSCRIPTS RECEIVED AND ROUTED TO THE FILE ROOM] (Mastagni, David) Modified on 3/23/2007 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 3/19/2007 GRANTING #79 that the deadline to complete VDRP is EXTENDED to 7/20/2007.(Reader, L)
March 19, 2007 Filing 79 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties to Extend Time to Complete VDRP by City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER #77 signed by Judge David F. Levi on 3/1/2007 ORDERING Discovery for Expert Witnesses CONTINUTED to 3/30/2007. (Reader, L)
February 28, 2007 Filing 77 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER By the Parties to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery Cutoff [For Expert Witnesses]; Proposed Order Re Same by City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 2/27/07 STIPULATING between the parties and MODIFYING the #10 Scheduling Order; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 3/7/07. (Yin, K)
February 22, 2007 Filing 75 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure by City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 1/25/07 ORDERING the Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Disclosure is MODIFIED up to and including 2/21/07. (Donati, J)
January 24, 2007 Filing 73 [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] COURT LETTER from VDRP Administrator appointing Timothy J. Long, Esq., of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP, as Neutral Attorney.(Martinez, L)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 1/23/07 ORDERING that VDRP shall be completed by 3/20/07. (cc VDRP Administrator Sacramento) (Donati, J)
January 23, 2007 Filing 71 JOINT AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING previously noticed for hearing on 2/14/2007 re #62 AMENDED MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing RESET for 4/25/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 1/24/2007 (Reader, L).
January 23, 2007 Filing 70 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure re #10 Scheduling Order, by City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
January 16, 2007 Filing 69 [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] WITHDRAW of NEUTRAL ATTORNEY Robin K. Perkins, Esq. Attorney Robin K. Perkins terminated due to conflict of interest.(Martinez, L)
January 16, 2007 Filing 68 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time of VDRP Completion by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar, City of Vallejo. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Yamada, Willy)
January 12, 2007 Filing 67 STATEMENT of /Defendant's Undisputed Material Facts ISO Amended Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Defendant City of Vallejo. (Whitefleet, John)
January 12, 2007 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Chief Robert W. Nichelini in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication. (Whitefleet, John)
January 12, 2007 Filing 65 DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet in Support of Amended Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Decl of JRW)(Whitefleet, John)
January 12, 2007 Filing 64 EXHIBIT to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. (Whitefleet, John)
January 12, 2007 Filing 63 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by City of Vallejo. in Support of Amended Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication (Whitefleet, John)
January 12, 2007 Filing 62 AMENDED MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT amending #60 AMENDED MOTION for JUDGMENT /Adjudication and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 1/24/2007 (Reader, L).
January 12, 2007 Filing 61 AMENDED NOTICE OF AMENDED MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT amending #60 AMENDED MOTION for JUDGMENT , or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 1/16/2007 (Caspar, M). Modified on 1/24/2007 (Reader, L).
November 29, 2006 Filing 60 JOINT AMENDED CROSS-MOTIONS #35 #58 for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication by City of Vallejo. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/30/2006 (Marciel, M).
November 16, 2006 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar re #58 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mastagni, David)
November 15, 2006 Filing 58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Attachments: #1 Statement #2 Points and Authorities #3 Declaration #4 Exhibit part 1 #5 Exhibit part 2 #6 Exhibit part 3 #7 Exhibit part 4 #8 Exhibit part 5) (Mastagni, David) Modified on 11/16/2006 (Donati, J).
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge David F. Levi on 10/10/06: Attorney Terence J. Cassidy is Substituted in as Attorney for City of Vallejo, and Attorneys Frederick Soley, Claudia Quintana, and Alesia Jones-Martin are Terminated. (Krueger, M) Modified on 10/11/2006 (Krueger, M).
October 6, 2006 Filing 56 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by City of Vallejo. (Cassidy, Terence)
October 4, 2006 Filing 55 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEYS (PROPOSED) by City of Vallejo. Attorney Cassidy, Terence John added. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 10/6/2006 (Kirkpatrick, S).
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 9/28/06 ORDERING that Defendant's 8/24/06 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER #40 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Request for expenses is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 26, 2006 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 9/21/06 before the Honorable John F. Moulds. (TEXT ONLY - Maintained on Paper) (Schultz, C)
September 21, 2006 Filing 52 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held on 9/21/2006 before Judge John F. Moulds : MOTION HEARING re #40 Deft's MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER.All parties present. Arguments heard. After consideration, the Court ordered Deft's Motion DENIED. Court order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel David Mastagni and Will Yamada present. Defendants Counsel Claudia Quintana present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO, CD 1 of 1. (Cannarozzi, N)
September 18, 2006 Filing 51 JOINT STATEMENT of Discovery Disagreement Regarding Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by Defendant City of Vallejo #40 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Quintana in Support and as Attachment C#2 Attachment A)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 9/19/2006 (Reader, L).
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 9/12/06 ORDERING that: on 9/14/06, at 11:00 a.m., the parties shall meet and confer in person concerning the matters at issue in dft's 8/17/06 Motion to Compel; said meeting shall take place at the U.S. Courthouse; the parties shall contact Connie Farnsworth to obtain the specific location for this meeting; the parties shall file a joint stipulation reporting on the results of the conference no later than Monday, 9/18/06; and Dft's #38 Motion for Protective Order shall be continued for hearing, if necessary, on Thursday 9/21/06 @ 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom # 26. (Brown, T)
September 12, 2006 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENT by City of Vallejo re #48 Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Affidavit of Claudia Quintana re: Discovery Disagreement)(Quintana, Claudia)
September 11, 2006 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT re #40 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Notice of Motion by City of Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Quintana, Claudia)
September 11, 2006 Filing 47 DECLARATION of David E. Mastagni in Opposition to. Motion for Protective Order and Notice of Motion (Mastagni, David)
September 11, 2006 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #40 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Notice of Motion. (Mastagni, David)
September 8, 2006 Filing 45 [DISREGARD COUNSEL TO REFILE CORRECT DOCUMENTS] MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION by plts to #40 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David E. Mastagni )(Mastagni, David) Modified on 9/11/2006 (Duong, D). Modified on 9/11/2006 (Reader, L).
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER #42 signed by Judge David F. Levi on 8/30/2006 ORDERING Extention of time to complete the VDRP is hereby ADOPTED by the Court for the case and the parties are ORDERED to comply with this order, VDRP shall be completed by 3/13/2007. (Reader, L)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 8/29/06 DENYING #41 Ex Parte Application without prejudice to refiling in compliance with the local rules.(Donati, J)
August 29, 2006 Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Re Extending Time of VDRP Completion by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar, City of Vallejo. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/29/2006 (Reader, L).
August 28, 2006 Filing 41 EX PARTE APPLICATION by City of Vallejo for Order Shortening Time and to Recall Deposition Subpoenas of Lee and Liddicoet. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Declaration of Claudia Quintana#2 Declaration of Vanessa Garcia#3 Attachment to Declaration of Vanessa Garcia#4 Proposed Order)(Quintana, Claudia)
August 24, 2006 Filing 40 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Notice of Motion by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2006 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (PAN) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quintana, Claudia)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 8/22/2006 GRANTING #36 Motion to Continue Summary Judgment by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar. #35 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motion Hearing RESET for 12/13/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi.(Reader, L)
August 17, 2006 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by City of Vallejo [SEE DOCUMENT #38 FOR IMAGE]. (Reader, L)
August 17, 2006 Filing 38 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(C) by City of Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Quintana in Support#2 Attachment to Declaration of Claudia Quintana#3 Proposed Order)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 8/21/2006 (Reader, L).
August 17, 2006 Filing 37 OPPOSITION to Pltfs' Request for continuance of summary judgment motion #36 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Quintana in Support of Opposition#2 Attachment to Declaration of Claudia Quintana)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 8/21/2006 (Reader, L).
August 11, 2006 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion to Continue Summary Judgment by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Proposed Order #2 Declaration of William J. Lenehan#3 Declaration of Straun Boston#4 Declaration of David E. Mastagni)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/14/2006 (Yin, K).
July 26, 2006 Filing 35 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT or in the alternative summary adjudication by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities #2 Undisputed Material Facts#3 Request for Judicial Notice#4 Exhibit A & B to Request for Judicial Notice#5 Declaration of Claudia Quintana#6 Exhibits A & B to Declaration of Claudia Quintana#7 Declaration of Chief Robert W. Nichelini#8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chief Robert W. Nichelini)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 7/27/2006 (Reader, L).
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 05/23/06: Documents produced pursuant to the Order compelling pltfs to produce records will be produced pursuant to this Order. (Kirkpatrick, S)
May 22, 2006 Filing 33 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by City of Vallejo. (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 5/23/2006 (Reader, L).
May 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 05/02/06 ORDERING that the hearing date of 05/04/06 on defendant's motion to compel production of documents #29 , #24 is VACATED. Defendant's Motion to compel production of documents filed 03/14/06 #24 and supplemented on 04/27/06 #29 is GRANTED. Within ten days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall provide the documents responsive to the 9/29/05 production of documents. All documents produced pursuant to this order are subject to a protective order and shall be used only in connection with the conduct of this litigation. The parties' requests for expenses and/or sanctions are denied.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 1, 2006 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery by City of Vallejo. (Attachments: #1 Attachments/Letter #2 Affidavit of Claudia Quintana)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 5/2/2006 (Reader, L).
April 28, 2006 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion to Compel. (Yamada, Willy)
April 27, 2006 Filing 29 DEFENDANT(S) MOTION to COMPEL Discovery by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2006 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit/Attachment #2 Declaration of Claudia Quintana#3 Proposed Order)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 4/28/2006 (Reader, L).
April 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER #27 signed by Judge David F. Levi on 4/11/2006; EXTENDING time to complete the VDRP program to 8/30/2006; the parties are ORDERED to comply with this order. (Reader, L)
April 7, 2006 Filing 27 AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by City of Vallejo. to Extending Time of VDRP Completion. (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 4/11/2006 (Reader, L).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER #25 signed by Judge David F. Levi on 4/6/06 GRANTING the parties an Extension of Time until 6/30/06 to Complete the VDRP Program. (cc: Linda Martinez). (Krueger, M)
April 3, 2006 Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Extending Time of VDRP Completion by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar, City of Vallejo. (Mastagni, David)
March 14, 2006 Filing 24 DEFENDANT(S) MOTION to COMPEL production of documents by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2006 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 4/11/2006 (Reader, L).
March 6, 2006 MINUTE ORDER: The court approves the proposed notice submitted by plaintiff to other persons who may wish to "opt-in" to this lawsuit. However, it is not necessary, and could be confusing, for the notice to come from the court under the court's signature. Counsel for plaintiff may issue the notice. The cut off date for joining the action should be amended to May 12, 2006.(TEXT ONLY) ? (Vine, H)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to AMEND Answer by City of Vallejo signed by Judge David F. Levi on 2/1/2006. (Reader, L)
January 20, 2006 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 78-230(h), the motion(s) now calendared for hearing on January 24, 2006 are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument. (TEXT ONLY) (Vine, H)
January 11, 2006 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: Notice resetting hearing date. (Vine, H)
January 10, 2006 Filing 21 REPLY/RESPONSE to PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER by City of Vallejo. (Quintana, Claudia)
January 4, 2006 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #17 MOTION to AMEND/CORRECT Answer AND NOTICE OF MOTION Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition with Exhibits#2 Proof of Service)(Mastagni, David)
December 13, 2005 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER by City of Vallejo. (Quintana, Claudia)
December 13, 2005 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Claudia Quintana in support of motion for leave to serve amd pleading by City of Vallejo. (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 4/11/2006 (Reader, L).
December 13, 2005 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND answer by City of Vallejo. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Attachments: #1 Amended answer)(Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 4/11/2006 (Reader, L).
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the case is REFERRED to the VDRP; Case Referred to VDRP signed by Judge David F. Levi on 10/7/2005. (Reader, L)
September 30, 2005 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Claudia Quintana in Opposition To Plaintiffs Request for Hoffman-LaRoche Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quintana, Claudia)
September 30, 2005 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' request for issuance of Hoffman-LaRoche Notice. (Quintana, Claudia) Modified on 10/3/2005 (Reader, L).
September 30, 2005 Filing 13 CONSENT to VDRP by City of Vallejo(Jones-Martin, Alesia)
September 29, 2005 Filing 12 CONSENT to JURISDICTION by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar. (Mastagni, David)
September 23, 2005 Filing 11 BRIEF by all plaintiffs FOR NOTIFYING AND OPTING-IN ADDITIONAL SIMILARLY SITUATED PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Declaration #3 Proof of Service)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 10/3/2005 (Reader, L).
August 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge David F. Levi on 8/26/05: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/5/2007. Discovery due by 3/2/2007. Dispositive Motion due by 5/9/2007. Hearing on such Motions shall be on 6/6/07 at 10:00. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2007 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 10/1/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (DFL) before Chief Judge David F. Levi. (Marciel, M)
August 5, 2005 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (Mastagni, David)
August 5, 2005 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar, City of Vallejo. (Mastagni, David)
June 22, 2005 Filing 7 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by City of Vallejo.(Jones-Martin, Alesia)
June 13, 2005 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Wynathen Ketchum. City of Vallejo served on 6/8/2005, answer due 6/28/2005. (Yamada, Willy)
June 3, 2005 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms #2 VDRP Forms) (Dotson, B)
June 3, 2005 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Vallejo* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Will M. Yamada, Esq.* *Mastagni, Holstedt, Amick, et al.* *1912 I Street* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Dotson, B)
June 3, 2005 RECEIPT number 10034 for $250.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Kathleen R. Mastagni. (Dotson, B)
June 1, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Fair Labor Standars Act against City of Vallejo, filed by Wynathen Ketchum, Ana Menjivar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yamada, Willy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketchum et al v. City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynathen Ketchum
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Menjivar
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Alan M. Cohen
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Represented By: Alesia Francine Jones-Martin
Represented By: Claudia M. Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VDRP
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?