Alcaraz v. Giurbino

Case Number: 2:2005cv01597
Filed: August 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/07/10 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/2/10, ORDERING the Clerk to redact the first five numbers of petitioner's social security number on 52 the application for a COA, and include only the last for numbers. (Kastilahn, A)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/23/10, ORDERING that 47 petitioner's request for ext of time is GRANTED; and petitioner may file a notice of appeal ON or BEFORE 5/14/10. (Kastilahn, A)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/21/10 ORDERING that petitioner's 47 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED; the date to which appeal the 46 03/16/10 order is EXTENDED to 05/14/10. (Benson, A.)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/08/09 recommending that petitioner's 08/20/09 motion to stay be denied. MOTION to STAY 28 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Peter A. Nowinski on 8/16/05 ORDERING: Ptnr's IFP Application 2 is GRANTED; Resp shall respond to ptnr's petition for HC w/in 60 days; Ptnr's reply shall be filed w/in 30 days of service of answer; If response t o ptnr's petition is a motion, ptnr's opposition/non-opposition shall be filed w/in 30 days thereafter, and resp's reply shall be filed w/in 15 days thereafter; Clerk shall serve copy of this order together w/copy of ptnr's 8/11/05 petition for writ of HC and brief in support of petition for HC on AG Jo Graves. (cc:Jo Graves) (Girgis, C) Modified on 8/17/2005 (Girgis, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcaraz v. Giurbino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?