Jackson v. Andreasen et al
Case Number: |
2:2005cv01872 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2005 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence K. Karlton |
Presiding Judge: |
John F. Moulds |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 24, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/24/09 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 10/27/09 66 are ADOPTED in full; Plaintiff's 3/2/09 55 and 3/06/09 56 Requests, construed as Motion for relief from judgment are DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
66
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/26/09 recommending that plaintiff's 03/02/09 and 03/06/09 requests, construed as a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to FRCP 60(b) be denied. Requests 55 , 56 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 08/27/09 ordering plaintiff's 05/18/09 and 06/23/09 motions 60 , 61 are denied. Plaintiff is granted 1 final period of 30 days from the date of this order in which to supplement his motion for relief from judgment. No further extensions of time will be granted for any reason. (Plummer, M)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 08/11/09 ordering within 10 days from the date of this order defendants shall file and serve a response to plaintiff's 05/18/09 and 06/23/09 motions 60 , 61 . The deadline for plaintiff to supplement his motion for relief from judgment is vacated and will be reset, as appropriate, by subsequent order of the court.(Plummer, M)
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 04/01/09 ordering the documents filed by plaintiff on 03/02/09 and 03/06/09 55 , 56 taken together are construed as a motion for relief from judgment. So construed, plaintiff is granted 30 days f rom the date of this order to supplement the motion with (1) objections to this court's 01/14/09 findings and recommendations, including a proposed pretrial statement; and (2) an opposition, if any he has, to defendants 09/26/09 motion for summary judgment. Defendants are granted 45 days from the date of this order to file, as appropriate, a response to plaintiff's Rule 60(b) motion.(Plummer, M)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
53
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 52 , in full, signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/19/2009. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Marciel, M)
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/13/09 ORDERING defendants are relieved from filing a pretrial statement. The pretrial conference set for 01/09/09 is vacated. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?