May 11, 2018 |
Filing
802
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/18 GRANTING 798 Motion to modify the protective order. The May 17, 2018 hearing is VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 25, 2012 |
Filing
794
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/24/12 ORDERING that Mr. Couturier is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not compel him to authorize communication between Mr. Saakvitne and the IRS with regard to Couturier's Palm Desert property tax refund claim. Couturier shall file his stated reasons by on or before August 24, 2012. If the Court requires any further briefing from the parties, it will issue another order at that time. (Matson, R)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
793
AGREED ORDER signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 5/25/10 ORDERING the Orders granting pltfs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed 9/26/08 and 10/24/08 398 450 are DISOLVED; the Clerk of the Court is directed to return to pltfs 39; counsel each bond in the amount of $5,000 posted with respect to each temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction issued by this Court at dockets 367 398 408 and 450 and any applicable accrued interest. (cc: Sacramento Financial Dept) (Carlos, K)
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing
774
ORDER DENYING Motion to Intervene by Bruce Couturier at Docket 738 . (Short, Jan)
|
February 4, 2010 |
Filing
751
ORDER preliminarily approving Settlement and setting Hearing signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/3/2010. Fairness Hearing set for 3/5/2010 at 02:00 PM (RBB). (Marciel, M)
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing
726
STIPULATION and ORDER Consolidating Cases for Settlement. (Mailed to Robert Eddy) (Short, Jan)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
723
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/09 ORDERING the Stipulation for Extending the Deadline for Execution of a Definitive Settlement Agreement filed December 15, 2009 is hereby GRANTED. The settlement agreements and proposed consent decrees shall be executed by all parties and filed with the court by December 18, 2009. No further extensions will be granted except upon a showing of extraordinarycause.(Becknal, R)
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
721
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/09 GRANTING 720 Stipulation and Proposed Order for extending the deadline for execution of a definitive settlement agreement. The settlement agreements and proposed consent decrees shall be executed by all parties and filed with the court by 12/15/09. (Engbretson, K.)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing
718
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/12/09 ORDERING that the current hearing date on Pltf's Motion to Compel Discovery is VACATED. The parties Joint Statement will be due by 11/12/09. (Engbretson, K.)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
607
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/21/09 ordering defendant Couturier's motion to file physician's statement under seal, filed 07/27/09 594 is granted. Defendant shall serve plaintiffs with the physician statement. Plaintiff's motion for order extending time limits for depositions of defendants Couturier and Johanson filed 07/06/09 574 is granted in part. Couturier's further deposition will be permitted for a total of 5 more hours, but shall be c ontinued to the beginning of October 2009, prior to discovery cutoff, on a date agreed to by the parties. Plaintiff's are permitted to depose defendant Johanson for 6 more hours. Said deposition shall be scheduled by stipulation of the parties for a date in September, 2009, as arranged by Valerie Callen, courtroom clerk to the undersigned (916) 930-4199 in the jury froom of courtroom #24. Defendant Couturier's motion to compel further discovery responses and depsotion testimony filed 06/19/09 568 is denied. (See order for further details). (Plummer, M)
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing
589
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/22/09 ORDERING that because defendants' 572 motion to compel is a duplicate of defendants' motion already set to be heard on 8/6/09, it is VACATED from the calendar for 7/30/09. (Gaydosh, J)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
588
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/22/09 ORDERING that Defendant Couturier's 578 motion to strike, filed July 10, 2009, is DENIED. The parties shall file a joint statement in regard to plaintiffs 574 motion, in accordance with E.D. Local Rule 37-251(c), no later than July 30, 2009. Plaintiff's initially filed memorandum will be ignored. (Duong, D)
|
July 14, 2009 |
Filing
582
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/13/09 in accordance with the Court's order of 6/30/09 573 .(Carlos, K)
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing
575
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/9/09 ORDERING that Defendant filed a discovery motion on 06/19/09 set for hearing on 7/30/09 at 10:00, a.m.; Notwithstanding the three days specified by E.D. Cal. L.R. 37-251 the joint statemen t shall be filed in no later than five court days before the scheduled hearing. Notwithstanding E.D. Cal. L.R. 5-133(f), if the joint statement is more than 25 pages, or the attachments are longer than 50 pages, the copy shall be hand delivered or sent by overnight mail to chambers on the day of filing. The filing deadline, accordingly, will be 7/23/09. (Becknal, R)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing
539
ORDER signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/3/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Instanter Supplemental Complaint, to Join New Party Defendant Bruce Couturier, and to Grant Temporary RestrainingOrder and Preliminary Injunction at Docket 483 is DENIED. Motion terminated. (Becknal, R)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
537
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/22/09 ORDERING that documents shall be produced for in camera review in accordance with this order no later than 01/26/09. (Manzer, C)
|
January 12, 2009 |
Filing
534
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 1/9/09 ORDERING that the action denominated Chao v.Couturier, et al., 2:08-cv- 02732-FCD-GGH, is reassigned to Judge Ralph R. Beistline and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the eassigned case are hereby VACATED. The Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of the above-reference case to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|