Hecker v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv02441
Filed: December 1, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/16/15: The modified notice attached as Attachment A to the Declaration of Jay C. Russell (ECF No. 140) is approved. Not later than January 22, 2015, defendants shall post the modified notice approved by this order in all inpatient mental health units operated by the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR) and the Department of State Hospitals (DSH) in whichclass members may be housed and shall file written certification that said notice has been posted. (Kaminski, H)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/14 ORDERING that on or before 1/15/2015, the parties shall show cause in writing why the notice to the Hecker class should not be posted forthwith in all inpatient program units in whi ch members of the Coleman class are housed or, in the alternative, certify by declaration that such notice has been posted. On or before 1/23/15, the parties shall file in this action and in Coleman v. Brown an agreed revised notice to the Coleman c lass. On or before 1/15/15, 2015, Plaintiffs shall either request voluntary dismissal of named Plaintiffs Robert Hecker, Christopher Lee Jenkins, Ying Watt, Askia Ashanti, Daniel Hunley, Michael Lovelace, Samuel D'Angelo, Jr., and Jon Schooley or show cause in writing why said Plaintiffs should not be dismissed from this action. In addition, by the same date Plaintiffs shall clarify whether named Plaintiffs John Mueller and Quinton Gray are currently incarcerated. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/3/2014 GRANTING Leave to file proposed order on Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. (Donati, J)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/7/2014 GRANTING 124 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement; VACATING the Status Conference set for 8/8/2014. (Michel, G)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/10/2014 ORDERING that a Status Conference is set for 7/10/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Zignago, K.)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/05/14 ordering the parties hereby stipulate to the extending of any deadline for plaintiff's to renew their motion to lift the stay until 06/06/14. (Plummer, M)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER extending deadline for Plaintiffs to renew their motion to lift the stay until March 14, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/4/14. (Kaminski, H)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/2/2014 GRANTING 110 that the parties stipulate to the extending of any deadline for Plaintiffs to renew their motion to lift the stay until 2/28/2014. (Reader, L)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/13/13 ordering that the parties hereby stipulatioe to the extending of any deadline for plaintiff's to renew their motion to lift the stay until 12/31/13. (Plummer, M)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/11/13 ORDERING that The parties shall resume the meet and confer process required by the courtsOctober 19, 2012 order 102 ; The meet and confer process required by this order shall be completed by August 16, 2013. Plaintiffs March 1, 2013 motion for relief from stay 103 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal, as appropriate, not later than September 5, 2013. The hearing set for April 19, 2013 before the undersigned is dropped from calendar. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Matthew A. Lopes, Jr., Esq.(Dillon, M)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/18/12 ordering plaintiff's 12/14/07 motion 78 is superseded by plaintiff's 09/19/12 motion 94 . The meet and confer process required by this order shall be completed by 02/15/13. Pl aintiff's 09/19/12 motion to lift the stay of this action 94 is denied without prejudice to its renewal, as appropriate, not later than 03/01/13. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Matthew A. Lopes Jr., Esq., Pannone Lopes & Devereaux LLC, 317 Iron Horse Way, Suite 301, Providence RI 02908. (Copy of this order mailed to Matthew A. Lopes Jr. Esq. at the address listed above)(Plummer, M) Modified on 10/19/2012 (Plummer, M).
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/18/12 DENYING without prejudice 93 Motion to Dismiss ; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on inmate Jenkins at the address on said motion. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hecker v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?