Bernabe v. Schwartz et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv02522
Filed: December 9, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/13/09 DENYING 82 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 92 Motion for Extension of Time; Dft's response to pltf's objections due within 15 days. (Owen, K)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/19/09 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations 88 are ADOPTED IN FULL; pltf's motion for summary judgment 67 is DENIED. (Carlos, K)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/20/09 ordering defendants' motion to compel 86 is granted. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall serve responses to set one interrogatories propounded on plaintiff b y defendants Altcheck, McAllister, Jones, King, Nelson and Ware. Defendants request for sanctions is denied without prejudice to renewal if plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Defendants' request for an extension of the dispositive motion cut-off date is granted.(Dispositive Motion due by 4/30/2009.) (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernabe v. Schwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?