Rosenblum v. Mule Creek St Prison Medical Officials, et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv00764
Filed: April 10, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/20/09 ORDERING that plf's 71 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED IN PART; plf shall place his objections to the F&Rs in the mail on or before 09/15/09. Dfts' reply, if any, shall be filed and served w/i 7 days thereafter. No further extensions of time will be granted for this purpose. (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/5/09 ORDERING that pltf's 67 request to voluntarily dismiss the dft Nale is GRANTED; and RECOMMENDING that dfts' 50 motion to dismiss be granted; dft Akanna be dismissed; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 20 days.(Yin, K)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/18/2009 GRANTING defendants' 58 Second Request/Motion for Extension of Time. They have to and including 2/24/2009 to reply to plaintiff's 55 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Marciel, M)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/06/09 ordering defendants are granted a 2 week extension of time to and including 02/17/09 to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenblum v. Mule Creek St Prison Medical Officials, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?