Doe et al v. The Regents of the University of California et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01043
Filed: May 11, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/2/2011. Defendants Sylvia Lopez's 153 and Sheridan Myamoto's 154 Bill of Costs are DENIED. (Marciel, M)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/17/11: Ms. Lowrie is not sanctioned $1,000 for her failure to pay the $150 sanction as ordered by this court on January 21, 2011. The court VACATES its January 21, 2011 order ONLY INSOFAR as it sanctions Ms. Lowrie the amount of $150. (Kaminski, H)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/28/11 ORDERING Ms. Lowrie to appear for a hearing on 3/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton to determine whether a further sanction of $1000 should issue for her failure to pay the $150 sanction and file the accompanying affidavit. The Clerk is directed to serve the orders identified by Doc. Nos. 249, 150, 151 and this order upon plaintiffs' legal guardians at the following address: 6105 Francine Drive, Sacramento, CA 95824-4251 and upon the State Bar of California at the following address: Intake Unit, The State Bar of California, 1149 South Hill Street, Los Angeles, California 90015. (Matson, R)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/8/11 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter Judgment for Defendants. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 01/21/11 ORDERING that counsel for plf is SANCTIONED $150 for failure to respond to the 149 01/07/11 OSC, paid to the Clerk of the Court w/i 30 days. The pretrial and trial dates are VACATED; counsel for plf is further ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed as a sanction for failure to respond to the 149 OSC. Counsel shall file a response to this OSC by 01/28/11. (Benson, A.)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/7/2011 ORDERING that Counsel for plaintiffs is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why sanctions should not issue for her failure to timely file plaintiffs' pretrial statements in accorda nce with Local Rule 110, including a fine of $150 or dismissal of this case within seven (7) days of the issuance of this order. The final pretrial conference set for January 10, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED. The court SETS a further final pretrial conference for February 7, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. (Duong, D)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/30/10: On 6/29/10, dft Miyamoto filed her expert witness disclosure. Dft attached two expert reports to her disclosure. These reports refer to the minor pltfs by their full names. Pursuant to E.D. Cal. Local Rule 140(a)(i), the court instructs the Clerk of Court to SEAL both reports, Dkt. Nos. [139-1] and [139-2]. (Carlos, K)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/18/09 ORDERING that the Chavez firm's request to withdraw is GRANTED. The docket shall reflect that Fernando Fabela Chavez and Hector Emilio Salitrero are RELIEVED as counsel for all plfs; C ounsel are ORDERED to release all client papers and property to clients w/i 15 days; Counsel is ORDERED to serve a copy of this order on plfs; plfs are GRANTED 120 days to find replacement counsel and notify the court of the name of their new counsel; the court determines that no sanction for the failure to file a timely trial brief is warranted. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. The Regents of the University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?