Watson v. Torruella et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01475
Filed: July 3, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/22/2012 DISMISSING Defendants J. Milliman, M.D. and Joseph Torruella, M.D. with prejudice. (Michel, G)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/23/12 ORDERING that counsel for all parties shall file, within 14 days after the filing date of this action, a joint report explaining current status of this action and of each party. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/16/12 ORDERING the parties, by and through their counsel, stipulate that Plaintiff Garry P. Watson's claims against Defendant Richard Galloway, M.D. are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Richard Galloway, M.D. agrees to waive any claim against Plaintiff arising from this action, including, but not limited to, any claim for defense costs or attorneys' fees. (Becknal, R)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE DISPOSAL DOCUMENTS AFTER NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/26/12; ORDERING that the dispositional documents disposing of the case are to be filed no later than seven days following Plaintiff's receipt of the settlement proceeds. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED.(Kastilahn, A)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/10 and agreed by the parties EXTENDING TIME for pltf to complete Dr. Torruella's deposition by 11/18/10; parties initial expert disclosures due by 12/8/10; discovery due by 3/7/2011.(Yin, K)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/1/10 ORDERING that the parties are to file, on or before 4/22/10, a joint statement which: specifically identifies all further discovery which each party seeks; suggests mutually acceptable and reasonable shortened-time deadlines for completing each item or category of discovery, including recommended dates for concluding expert disclosures, obtaining expert depositions, and all further discovery; recommend, only if applicable, a dispositiv e motion deadline should defendants intend to file a motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs malpractice claim; and should defendants decline to file a motion for summary judgment, provide agreed-upon recommended and alternate dates for jury trial, including the estimated length of trial.(Dillon, M)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/16/10 ordering Dean A. Morehous, Jr. is appointed to represent plaintiff. ( Status Conference set for 4/1/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.). Al l parties shall appear by counsel who shall be prepared to discuss the current status of this action and how it should proceed. Dean A. Morehous Jr. shall contact Sujean Park, ADR and Pro Bono Program Director at 916-930-4278 if he has questions related to this appointment. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon counsel for all parties including Dean A. Morehous Jr., Winston & Strawn LLP, 101 California Street, 39th floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/23/09 ordering that the 12/18/09 order directing the filing of pretrial statements is vacated. (Plummer, M)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 [VACATED PURSUANT TO 12/23/09 ORDER]ORDER DIRECTING THE FILING OF PRETRIAL STATEMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/18/09 ORDERING pltf to file his pretrial statement and any motions necessary for trial witnesses w/in 30 days; df ts' pretrial statement due no later than 21 days after pltf's statement is filed; pretrial conference to be conducted on the file only; the date for jury trial before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton will be set in the pretrial order; pltf's 42 motion for discovery is DENIED. (Yin, K) Modified on 12/23/2009 (Plummer, M).
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/09 ordering that the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 30 days from the date this order is issued, to allow defendants an opportunity to move for summary judgment on plaintiff's medical malpractice claim.(Plummer, M)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/6/09 ORDERING that the 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The court orders that the magistrate judge allow dfts an opportunity to move for summary judgment on pltf's medical malpractice claim, and to reopen discovery, as necessary, for the motion. (Engbretson, K.)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/24/09 recommending that defendants' 08/07/08 motion for summary judgment be granted and that judgment be entered in favor of each defendant. Motion for Summary Judgment 29 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 15 days. (Plummer, M)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/4/09 ORDERING that w/in 20 days pltf to file an opposition to the 29 motion for summary judgment or statement of no opposition; failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; the court does not intend to grant pltf further extensions of time. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Torruella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?