Lopes v. Campbell et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01657
Filed: July 27, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CJA 20 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/11/09 as to Ty Lopes, for appointment by Arthur Pirelli. (Becknal, R)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/09 ORDERING Attorney Walter K Pyle APPOINTED for Ty Erik Lopes. (Carlos, K)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/14/09 ORDERING a Certificate of Appealability SHALL ISSUE in this action re Notice of Appeal 73 filed by Ty Erik Lopes. (Carlos, K)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ADOPTING 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/03/09; petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. CASE CLOSED(Benson, A.)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Due to the recent appointment of Recalled Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd to Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino for all further proceedings. The District Judge currently assigned to the case will remain unchanged. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopes v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?