Bumgardner et al v. Kupka et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv02205
Filed: May 17, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Peter A. Nowinski
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/28/2010 ORDERING Robert Kupka to appear personally before this court on June 2, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Edmund F. Brennan in Courtroom 24 (EFB) to answer concerning property of the judgment debtor. (Clerk served endorsed copy on claimant's attorney, J. Russell Cunningham) (Waggoner, D)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/27/10 ORDERING that the 60 , 61 Applications are DENIED without prejudice. (Owen, K)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/26/10, ORDERING that counsel's applications 57 , 58 , for orders that third parties Cynthia Kupka and Robert Kupka appear for exam in connection with the enforcement proceedings, are DENIED without prejudice to refiling with the required affidavits. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumgardner et al v. Kupka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?