Brodheim v. Dickinson, et. al.
Case Number: 2:2006cv02326
Filed: October 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/27/14 DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/12/2014 ORDERING that within 14 days, the parties shall address why, in light of the Gilman decision, there is any remedy left in this habeas corpus case that could possibly be invoked; both parties shall file a response that is ten pages or less in length. (Yin, K)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/5/2014 DENYING respondents' 12/20/2013 130 Motion for Reconsideration. (Marciel, M)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/17/14 ORDERING that Petitioner shall file a response to the Request for Reconsideration, on or before 1/31/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/9/2014. Petitioner shall file a Response to 130 Request for Reconsideration of 12/4/2013 124 Order, if any, within 10 dyas from date of this Order. (Marciel, M)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/23/13 ordering as to 110 MOTION for evidentiary hearing. ( Motion Hearing continued to 2/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.)(Plummer, M)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/16/13 ORDERING that a hearing for petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing is set for 1/23/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.(Dillon, M)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER adopting 118 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in part signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/3/13: 79 Motion to Dismiss granted in part and denied in part. (Kaminski, H)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/27/13 RECOMMENDING that insofar as respondent has moved to dismiss the bias claims (remaining claims 2, 3, and 6), the motion be DENIED; with respect to the equal protection claim (7), the motion be granted and this claim be DISMISSED without prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are directed at Dkt. 79 . Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/16/2013 ORDERING that respondent's 116 request to vacate the briefing schedule or for an extension of time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part ; respondent shall file an opposition to petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing by 10/1/2013; petitioner may file a reply by 10/28/2013. (Yin, K)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/6/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 63, is GRANTED; The Clerk is directed to re-open this case; and Plaintiff may, within 21 days of the date of this order, file an amended complaint omitting his ex post facto claims. (Becknal, R)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/6/13 ORDERING that Respondent's 79 MOTION to DISMISS is reinstated; Respondent shall file an opposition by June 21, 2013. Should the Governor affirm the Boards decision prior to this date, petitioner shall file a statement to this effect in place of an opposition. A reply may be filed by June 28, 2013. The motion will then be taken under submission without a hearing.(Dillon, M)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/28/2013 ORDERING that petitioner's 102 request to vacate motions and scheduling dates will be heard on 2/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hol lows; the 2/28/2013 hearing on respondent's 79 motion to dismiss is VACATED from the calendar, to be rescheduled if necessary, following a decision on petitioner's request; opposition and reply dates for the 79 motion to dismiss will be rescheduled at a later time. (Yin, K)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/4/12 GRANTING 98 Motion for Extension of time. Petitioners response to the motion to dismiss is extended to October 1, 2012, respondents reply to the opposition shall be filed on or before November 1, 2012; and argument on the amended motion shall be heard on November 8, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 9.(Dillon, M)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/23/12 ADOPTING IN FULL 91 Findings and Recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/18/12 ordering that petitioner shall file any opposition to the amended motion to dismiss and any cross-motion for an evidentiary hearing on or before 07/27/12; respondents' reply to the opposition and to any cross-motion should be filed on or before 08/28/12; any reply by petitioner to an opposition to any cross-motion must be filed on or before 09/11/12; argument on the amended motion shall be heard on 09/20/12 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 9. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/7/12 RECOMMENDING that the civil rights action, Case No. Civ-S-05-1512 LKK GGH P, be dismissed without prejudice to the ruling in the Gilman class. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/28/12 ORDERING that plaintiff show cause, within fourteen days, why the civil rights action, Case No. Civ-S-05-1512 LKK GGH P, should not be dismissed forthwith.(Dillon, M)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/31/12 ordering that all present motions, including the 04/05/12 motion 80 and scheduling dates are vacated pending the finality of the Board of Parole Hearings 01/11/12 decision granting parole to petitioner Michael Brodheim. On or before 06/15/12, the parties shall file a joint status report. (Plummer, M)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/3/12 ORDERING that Petitioner shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss and any cross- motion for an evidentiary hearing on or before January 28, 2012; Respondents reply to the opposit ion and to any cross-motion should be filed within 30 days of the filing of petitioners response; Any reply by petitioner to an opposition to any cross-motion must be filed within thirty days after the filing of such an opposition. The hearing currently set for February 2, 2012, is reset to Thursday, April 5, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.(Dillon, M)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/26/11 GRANTING 81 Motion for Extension of time. Petitioner shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss and any cross-motion for an evidentiary hearing on or before 11/28/11; Responden ts reply to the opposition and to any cross-motion should be filed within 30 days of the filing of petitioners response; Any reply by petitioner to an opposition to any cross-motion must be filed within thirty days after the filing of such an opposition.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/25/11 ORDERING that Respondent must file any Motion to Dismiss w/i 30 days; petitioner's opposition is due 30 days therafter; respondent's reply is due w/i 30 days of petitoner's opposition and any reply by petitioner to an opposition is due 30 days thereafter. (Benson, A.)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/27/11 ORDERING petitioner and respondent to file a joint status report within 21 days detailing what claims remain to be decided after remand, and what process is necessary to decide them.(Dillon, M)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/24/2011 ORDERING that in response to the 72 court's order, Judge Gregory G. Hollows will not require a joint status report re claims that remain to be decided and the process necessary to decide them until such time as a mandate from the Ninth Circuit may issue. (Yin, K)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/17/11 ORDERING that Petitioner and respondent shall file a joint status report within 21 days detailing what claims remain to be decided after remand, and what process is necessary to decide them.(Dillon, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/8/2010. (Matson, R)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/16/2010 DENYING 59 Motion to Stay. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/20/10 ORDERING the clerk of the court substitute the name of Kathleen Dickinson in place of M. Veal as respondent in the docket of this case. Also, RECOMMENDI NG that petitioner's writ be granted on the ground that BPH's continued reliance on immutable factors does not constitute "some evidence" of current or future dangerousness. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/30/10 ORDERING the parties to within 21 days file concurrent supplemental briefing regarding the en banc decision in Hayward v. Marshall; supplemental briefing not to exceed 10 pages. At the expiration of time for filing, the matter will be deemed submitted. (Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodheim v. Dickinson, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?