Campbell v. PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
Case Number: 2:2006cv02376
Filed: October 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/8/2015 GRANTING the 653 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; APPROVING the Settlement Agreement and Release; APPROVING the payment of the Fee Award and the Expense Award in the amo unt of $2,000,000.00 to Class Counsel in attorneys' fees and in the amount of $910,822.83 for Class Counsel's actual out-of-pocket expenses, to be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment; APPROVING a Class Representative Service Award of $10,000.00 to each of the Class Representatives, Jason Campbell and Sarah Sobek, to be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment; APPROVING the payment of reasonable Administrative Costs to t he Settlement Administrator Heffler Claims Group in an amount not to exceed $40,000.00; ORDERING that the plaintiffs' share of the Administrative Costs be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment; ORDERING that the de fendant's share of the Administrative Costs be paid for by the defendant in addition to the Gross Settlement Payment only to the extent that Opt Out Funds do not cover such costs; DISMISSING this action with prejudice and without prevaili ng party costs; DIRECTING the entry of this Final Approval Order and Judgment of Dismissal; ORDERING that the Court retain exclusive and continuing jurisdiction over the action, the class representatives, the class and the defendant. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 650 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2015. (Zignago, K.)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/30/2015 GRANTING 642 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Donati, J)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 646 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: MATTERS TO BE ADDRESSED AT 1/29/15 STATUS CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/20/15 645 . (Meuleman, A)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/17/14. The deadline for PWC to file its pretrial statement is continued to 1/8/15. (Manzer, C)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/2014 ORDERING 637 Defendant's Motion to modify scheduling order to permit PWC to file a motion to decertify the class before trial is hereby DENIED. (Reader, L)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/27/2014 REQUESTING that the parties inform the Court, and submit proposed dates (if necessary), within fourteen (14) days as to whether they would be amenable to attending a settlement conference prior to trial. (Michel, G)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/24/14: Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Experts, Davila and Johnigan 609 is DENIED, and both parties are hereby precluded from offering testimony referring to class members or similarly situated individuals as professionals. (Kaminski, H)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 605 STIPULATION and ORDER 604 extending deadline for completion of Expert Witness Discovery signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/2014. Completion of Expert Witnesses shall be 9/8/2014. Daubert Motion is due by 9/15/2014 and Oppostion to Daubert Motion to filed by 10/1/2014. (Marciel, M)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/6/2014 ORDERING disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses due by 7/8/2014; completion of expert witness discovery by 8/15/2014; filing of Daubert motions by 9/5/2014 ; filing of Daubert oppositions by 9/26/2014; filing of Daubert replies by 10/10/2014; filing of Plaintiffs' Pretrial Statement by 11/25/2014; filing of PwC's Pretrial Statement by 12/16/2014; and filing of trial briefs by 3/9/2015. (Zignago, K.)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/13/14 VACATING Pretrial Conference and Trial dates and RESETTING Final Pretrial Conference to 1/29/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley, Jury Trial to 3/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Motions in limine shall be filed with the Court on or before 1/8/15; and replies are due on or before 1/23/15. In the event that the parties decide that the date currently set for the parties' Daubert Hearing needs to be rescheduled, they are DIRECTED to file a stipulation with the Court which shall include an agreed upon date. (Meuleman, A)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 596 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/18/14 re: 593 EXTENDING Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline and Expert Witness Deposition Deadline. (Meuleman, A)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/14: Status Conference set for 3/6/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Dauber Hearing set for 10/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Jud ge Troy L. Nunley. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Manzer, C)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 RECUSAL ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/14 ORDERING All currently scheduled dates in the above-captioned cases are VACATED; The Clerk of the Court reassign these cases to another judge for all further proceedings, making appropriate adjustments in the assignments of civil cases to compensate for such reassignments; and these cases are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Troy L. Nunley, United States District Judge. (Becknal, R)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 589 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/25/13 CONTINUING hearing re: 586 Motion for Protective Order to 11/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The court has reviewed the parties' stipulation and ORDERS the following modification: the complete Joint Statement must be filed with the Court on 11/6/13 no later than 2:00 p.m. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 10/28/2013 (Meuleman, A).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/27/2013 RELATING this case to case number 2:13-cv-01322 KJM AC; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings; VACATING any dates currently set in the related case; Directing the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on January 30, 2013. On further consideration, the court now orders that the Scheduling Conference in this matter currently scheduled for February 4, 2013 is hereby VACATED. Counsel for defendant shall notify this court of the Ninth Circuits ruling on defendants Rule 23(f) petition for leave to file an interlocutory appeal (see ECF No. 564 ), and shall so notify this court within two (2) days of the Ninths Circuits ruling. (Rivas, A)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/23/13 ORDERING the court concludes that defendant has not established cause for postponing the Scheduling Conference. Accordingly, defendant's ex parte application (ECF No. 560 ), is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/28/12 ORDERING that 515 the motion to decertify the class is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/20/2012 DENYING 537 Defendant's request to seal. Plaintiff shall, within 7 court days of this order, file their Opposition to PWC's Motion to Decertify IN FULL and UN-REDACTED. Plaintiff sha ll file their 524 Kershaw Declaration IN FULL and UN-REDACTED and with ALL exhibits. The Clerk shall STRIKE Plaintiff's previously redacted 522 Opposition and 524 Kershaw Declaration. Defendant's 529 Request to Seal is GRANTED. (Donati, J)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/17/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' 507 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 04/09/12 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to STRIKE defendants' 539 Notice of New Authority; plaintiffs may file a sur-reply in opposition to defendants' 515 de-certification motion within 14 days. The sur-reply shall be no longer than 25 pages. (Benson, A.)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/12/12; Plaintiff shall file any additional declarations it wishes to bring to the court's attention no later than 14 days from the date of this order, together with any explanation of plaintiffs 9; views of these declarations. Plaintiffs' explanation shall not exceed 10 pages. Defendant shall have 14 days from the filing of plaintiffs' additional declarations to advise the court of its position regarding those declarations. Defendant's filing shall not exceed 10 pages.(Matson, R)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 521 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/21/12: HEARING as to 507 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER RESET for 3/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/7/12 ORDERING the Motion Hearing 507 reset for 2/27/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Becknal, R)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/13/12, ORDERING that plaintiffs' 507 Motion for Protective Order, is CONTINUED to 2/13/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kastilahn, A)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/15/11: The December 19, 2011 hearing on the motion 500 is VACATED without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/12/11: Defendant's motion to re-open discovery is DENIED 494 . Defendant SHALL file a new motion to decertify the class no later than February 17, 2012. Plaintiffs SHALL file an opposition to the decertification motion no later than March 2, 2012. Defendant SHALL file a reply, if any, no later than March 12, 2012. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/29/2011 DENYING 255 , 258 Motions for Summary Judgment and 402 Motion for Reconsideration, as moot; Parties may renotice the motions for hearing; GRANTING 394 Motion to Seal. The filing shall be tentatively SEALED. (Michel, G)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/9/11: Status Conference set for 9/19/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties shall file status reports fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Kaminski, H)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/13/2010 ORDERING that with respect to the pending motions to seal (Section A.), the parties MAY, within 14 days, file an explanation as to why the court should deviate from the proposal to vacate the 153 and 180 Orders. With respect to the missing documents, the party who filed each document shall file the missing document within 14 days. The documents listed in Section C shall be unsealed absent the filing of a motion to seal within 14 days. The court invites the parties to inform the court if any of its findings concerning the missing documents were in error. Such notices must be filed within 7 days. (Zignago, K.)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 07/08/09 ORDERING no bond is required. (Streeter, J)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/17/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff filed a discovery motion on 2/11/09 set for hearing on 3/12/09 at10:00. Notwithstanding the three (3) days specified by E.D. Cal. L.R. 37-251 the Joint Statement shall be filed in no later than five (5) court days before the scheduled hearing. Notwithstanding E.D. Cal. L.R. 5-133(f), if the joint statement is more than 25 pages, or the attachments are longer than 50 pages, the copy shall be hand delivered or sent by overnight mail to chambers on the day of filing. The filing deadline, accordingly, will be 3/05/09. (Becknal, R)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/17/09 ORDERING dft's ex parte application for order shortening time 358 359 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to its renewal if the district court approves the proposed extension of the discovery deadline. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?