United States of America v. Approximately $2,663.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Case Number: 2:2006mc00116
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: David F. Levi
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CONSENT JUDGMENT signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/17/13. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER 47 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/13/12, ORDERING that the dealine by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint forforfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 4/16/12. (Kastilahn, A)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER 45 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/19/11 ORDERING the United States' time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture is extended to 1/17/2012.(Matson, R)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/22/2011 RESETTING the Deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture for 10/19/2011. (Michel, G)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/18/2011 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the dft currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the dft currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 7/21/2011. (Zignago, K.)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/20/11 ORDERING that the deadline by which the U.S. shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 04/22/11. (Benson, A.)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/14/10 ORDERING that the deadline by which the US shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 1/23/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 33 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/2010 ORDERING the United States time to file a complaint is extended to 10/25/2010.(Matson, R)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/15/2010 ORDERING 31 that the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 7/26/2010. (Reader, L)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/25/10 ORDERING that the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to April 26, 2010. (Becknal, R)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/27/09 EXTENDING the United States' time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture to 1/25/10.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/24/09 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currently is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 10/26/09.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/09: Accordingly, the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to April 29, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $2,663.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?