Ostrofsky v. California State Department of Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Linda Ostrofsky
Defendant: California State Department of Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00987
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/15/10 ORDERING that on 11/10/10 plaintiff Linda Ostrofsky hereby voluntarily dismissed the instant action with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). 68 The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close this case and vacate all pending dates. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/30/10 ORDERING that, per 63 Stipulation, a Settlement Conference is SET for 10/19/10 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; the parties are directed to exchange and simultaneously deliver to the court non-confidential settlement conference statements 7 days prior to the conference. Additionally, the date for the parties' Rule 26 disclosures is CONTINUED to 11/15/10. (Benson, A.)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/10 ORDERING initial discovery shall take place on or before 9/1/2010; parties may conduct further discovery until 8/25/11; initial expert disclosures on o r before 6/2/11; and rebuttals on or before 6/23/11; all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be completed as described herein and pursuant to the Local and Federal Rules on or before 9/22/11; final pretrial conference is set b efore the Honorable Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/8/11 at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom No. 7; a joint pretrial statement shall be filed by 11/17/11, in accordance with Local Rules 281 and 282, and the requirements set forth herein; jury trial is set to commence before the Honorable Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/6/12 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 7. (Carlos, K)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/05/10 GRANTING 55 Request for Telephonic Appearance at the 08/12/10 Mandatory Scheduling Conference. (Williams, D)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/28/09 ADOPTING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. 24 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part; plft's claims pursuant to Title VII and FEHA are dismissed without leave to amend; pltf's claims pursuant to Rehabilitation Act and ADA are dismissed with leave to amend; pltf is granted leave to file 4th amended complaint within 60 days. (Owen, K)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/17/2009 recommending that 24 Motion to Dismiss filed defendant's be granted in part and denied in part; that plaintiff's claims pursuant to Title VII and FEHA be dismissed w/o leave to amend; that plaintiff's claims pursuant to the Rehabilitation Act and the ADA Act be dismissed with leave to amend; and that plaintiff be granted leave to file, w/i 60 days from filing date of any order adopting these F &Rs, a Fourth Amended Complaint setting forth claims for discrimination, hostile work environment, and retaliation pursuant to Rehabilitation Act and ADA Act. This matter is referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections may be filed w/i 10 days after the date of service of these findings and recommendations. (Waggoner, D)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/31/08 ORDERING that Plaintiffs second amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a third amended complaint in accordance with this order. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostrofsky v. California State Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ostrofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?