Collins v. Hedgpeth et al
Petitioner: Gerald V. Collins
Respondent: A. Hedgpeth and Attorney General for the State of California
Case Number: 2:2007cv01240
Filed: June 25, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Barbara J. Rothstein on 9/17/10 ORDERING petitioner's Request for Appointment of Counsel 28 DENIED. (Carlos, K)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Barbara J. Rothstein on 8/2/10, ORDERING that a COA is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Barbara J. Rothstein on 9/16/2009 ORDERING the court denies petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus. The case is hereby dismissed. CASE CLOSED.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Hedgpeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald V. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?