Reid v. D. K. Sisto

Defendant: D. K. Sisto
Petitioner: Kevin G Reid
Case Number: 2:2007cv01409
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John L. Weinberg on 2/24/10 VACATING 23 Order Deferring Preparation of Report and Recommendation. (Manzer, C)
November 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court [VACATED PER 24 ORDER] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John L. Weinberg on 10/30/2009. The Court will defer submission of a Report and Recommendation until the filing of the en banc decision in Hayward v. Marshall, 512 F.3d 536 (9th Cir. 2008), rehg en banc granted, 527 F.3d 797 (9th Cir. 2008). (Suttles, J) Modified on 2/24/2010 (Manzer, C).
July 26, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/07 ORDERING that the respondents are directed to file a response to petitioner's application within 30 days from the date of this order. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order together with a copy of the petition for writ of HC on Michael Farrell. (cc Michael Farrell)(Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin G Reid
Represented By: Benjamin P. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?