Dean v. Carey et al
Petitioner: Eric Dean
Respondent: Thomas Carey and Attorney General for the State of California
Case Number: 2:2007cv01531
Filed: July 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge M. Margaret McKeown on 7/25/12 ORDERING that in accord with the Ninth Circuit's order dated 4/20/11, this case is dismissed with prejudice as moot. (Becknal, R)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge M. Margaret McKeown on 11/22/10 DENYING 24 Motion to Stay. (Manzer, C)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge M. Margaret McKeown on 10/4/10 ORDERING that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is GRANTED; w/i 60 days of service of this order, the California Board of Parole Hearings must convene a new parole hearing for Dean and determine his eligibility for parole based on the Court's determinations set forth in this Order; and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Dean. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/07 ORDERING that within 30 days Ptnr shall submit an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Ptnr an IFP application. (Engbretson, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Carey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?