Lehr, et al. v. City of Sacramento, et al.
Plaintiff: Anthony Lehr, Connie Hopson, Floyd Hopwood, Michael Tinius, Jacki Fitzgerald, Jeremy McEntyre, Tammy Jones, Michael Moore, Lindsey Alesso, Valerie Dufour, Ronald Hicks, Loaves & Fishes, Sacramento Homeless Organizing Committee and Francis House
Defendant: City of Sacramento, Albert Najera, Mike Cooper, Mark Zoulas, Sacramento County, John McGinness, Anderson, McElheny and Bennett
Case Number: 2:2007cv01565
Filed: August 2, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/2/13. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiff class against Defendant, City of Sacramento, pursuant to the jury's verdict entered on 5/24/11 187 , and in accordance with the Courts Order of 4/1/13, awarding attorneys fees and costs to Plaintiffs 238 , and to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 AMENDED 237 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/1/2013. Plaintiff's 224 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs are entitled to attorney's fees in the amount of $745,778.00 and litigation expenses in the amount of $37,301.58 for a total of $783,079.58. Accordingly, defendant City of Sacramento directed to pay $783,079.58 to plaintiffs. (Marciel, M)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/22/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs 224 is GRANTED, in part. Plaintiffs are entitled to attorney's fees in the amount of $745,778.00 and litigation expenses in the amount of $37,301.58, for a total of $783,079.58. Defendant, the City of Sacramento, is accordingly directed to pay $783,079.58 to Plaintiffs. (Becknal, R)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION and ORDER 217 resolving damages portion of Trial signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/8/2012. (Marciel, M)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/6/12 ORDERING the Status Conference reset for 2/14/12 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Becknal, R)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/15/11 ORDERING the Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is therefore DENIED 189 ; Defendant's alternative Motion for a New Trial is also DENIED 189 . (Becknal, R)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re JURY COMMUNICATION signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/20/2011. Jury Instruction # 10 is modified as follows: "Practice or custom' means any widespread, well-settled practice or custom that constitutes a standard operating procedure of defendant City of Sacramento." (Marciel, M)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER FROM COURT TO JURY signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/19/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 JURY COMMUNICATION signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/18/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/2011 ORDERING that the Court finds that under FRCP 32(a)(4) and the totality of the circumstances, the following witnesses are indeed unavailable: Letecia Del Toro, Jana Martinez, Deborah Oliver, James Salter and James Venzant; however, as a result of plaintiff's failure to comply with 157 Order, the Court cannot determine whether the witnesses' testimony via deposition comports with FRE Rule 403; parties shall be prepared to address the admissibility of the evidence in question under Rule 403 at Status Conference SET for 5/16/2011 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Waggoner, D)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/5/2011 ORDERING that Defendant's 145 Motion to Exclude New Claims at Trial is DENIED. Plaintiffs may assert these two new claims at trial. A Modified Final Pretrial Order including Plaintiffs' additional assertions will be issued forthwith. The trial is confirmed for May 9, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7.(Duong, D)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/26/10. Defendants McElheny; John McGinness; Sacramento County; Anderson and Bennett are DISMISSED with prejudice. The City of Sacramento and the City Officers are the sole remaining Defendants in this class action case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER For Preliminary Approval of Provisional Settlement Class and Settlement of Class Action, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/10/09. On or before December 10, 2009, the Class Claims Administrator shall cause to be disseminated the N otice and Claim Form, substantially in the form attached to this order as Exhibits A and B, in the manner set forth in paragraphs 55 through 58 of the Stipulation of Settlement. Class members will have up to and including February 18, 2010, in which to object to this settlement or file claims. A hearing on final approval is SET for 3/25/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. The motion for final approval shall be filed no later than March 5, 2010. Objections, along with any notice of intent to appear, must be filed with the Court no later than February 18, 2010. (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 20 pltf's Motion to Certify Class, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/21/09. (Kastilahn, A)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/30/2009 ORDERING 88 the last day to hear dispositive motions from 6/11/2009, to 8/13/2009. Defendants' opposition (if any) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be e-filed and e-served by 5:00 p.m. on or before 7/30/2009. Plaintiffs' reply (if any) shall be e-filed and e-served by 5:00 p.m. on or before 8/7/2009. (Reader, L)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER 41 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/14/2009. The last day to hear Dispositive Motions is 6/11/2009. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehr, et al. v. City of Sacramento, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lehr
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Hopson
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Hopwood
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tinius
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacki Fitzgerald
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy McEntyre
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Alesso
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Dufour
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hicks
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loaves & Fishes
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Homeless Organizing Committee
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis House
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Najera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zoulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McElheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?