Sass v. Kramer, et al.
Petitioner: Brien Sass
Respondent: M. C. Kramer and The Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2007cv01603
Filed: August 6, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Barbara J. Rothstein on 10/6/10 ORDERING that the REQUEST for Certificate of Appealability 31 is GRANTED. A Certificate of Appealability is ISSUED in the present Action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Barbara J. Rothstein on 8/4/2010 ORDERING that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brian Sass is DENIED. CASE CLOSED. (Waggoner, D)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge Alfred T. Goodwin on 4/28/10. Senior Judge Alfred T. Goodwin recused. Case reassigned back to Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. The case number on all future pleadings shall be: 2:07-cv-1603 LKK GGH. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sass v. Kramer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. C. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brien Sass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?