Egyed v. Lassen County, et al
Plaintiff: Allona Egyed
Defendant: Lassen County, John McGarva and Steve Warren
Case Number: 2:2007cv01633
Filed: August 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/10/2009 GRANTING 23 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Pltfs Allona Egyed, individually and as guardian and conservator of Jason Egyed, and dfts County of Lassen, John McGarva and Steve Warren, hereby stipulate to dismiss the complaint filed herein with prejudice. It is further stipulated that the parties will bear their own costs, including attorneys fees. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/3/2009 ORDERING that this case is settled; pltf's counsel is granted an extension of time to file dispositional documents on or before 4/20/09. (Gaydosh, J)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/5/08 ORDERING that the records relating to this matter, be subject to a protective order fully incorporating the provisions set forth. (Anderson, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egyed v. Lassen County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allona Egyed
Represented By: Treva Jean Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGarva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?