Johnson v. Subia, et al

Plaintiff: David B. Johnson
Defendant: R. J. Subia, R. L. Heise, Jr., C. Campbell and R. Williams
Case Number: 2:2007cv02002
Filed: September 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 76 Motion for Reconsideration, 78 Motion to Correct Judgment, and 79 Motion to Stay signed by District Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/17/11. (Matson, R)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/22/10. The Clerk shall SEAL and STRIKE Plaintiff's Declaration with Exhibits 66 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 11/22/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to take depositions via Videoconference at same time Defendants take depositions on Plaintiff 58 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/3/2010 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 45 is AFFIRMED; Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss the retaliation claim against Dft Campbell based on allegations that Campbell prevented pltf from filing an administrative grievance be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss claim against dft Heise based on allegations that Heise destroyed pltf's grievance is DENIED. (Reader, L)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 10/26/2010 DENYING plaintiff's 54 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Marciel, M)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Proceed signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 9/28/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery shall proceed as directed in this order. Discovery deadline is set for 2/20/2011. Pretrial motion shall be filed on or before 2/20/2011. Pretrial conference and trial dates will be set, as appropriate, following adjudication of any dispositive motion, or the expiration of time for filing such a motion. (Waggoner, D)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 09/22/10 ORDERING that the 41 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and RECOMMENDING that that plf's retaliation claim against dft Campbell based on allegations that Campbell prevented plf from filing administrative grievances be dismissed. Plaintiff's allegations that Campbell failed to adequately respond to the grievance and prevented plf from filing the grievance when Campbell delivered the grievance to Heise fail tostate a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections to these F&Rs w/i 20 days; referred to Judge Phillip M. Pro. (Benson, A.)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 10/26/2009 GRANTING pltfs 33 Motion to Withdraw; WITHDRAWING pltfs 25 Motion for Default; GRANTING dfts 27 Motion for Extension of Time; dfts shall respond to complaint within 30 days. The stay in this matter is lifted. (Suttles, J)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge George W. Foley on 1/21/2009 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall provide to Pltf a blank summons, a copy of the pleading filed 6/4/2008, 2 USM-285 forms and instructions for ser vice of process on Dfts Campbell and Heise. Within 20 days of service of this Order, Pltf may return the attached Notice of Submission of Documents with the completed summons, the completed USM-285 forms, and 3 copies of the endorsed, 16 Third Amen ded Complaint to the court; RECOMMENDING that Pltfs Third Amended Complaint 16 against dft Williams should be dismissed, with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Referred to Judge Philip M. Pro. Written objections due within 10 days. (Forms sent to D. Johnson: 1 summons, Amd complaint, 2 USM-285 forms and instructions for service of process) (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Subia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Subia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Heise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?