Banks v. Walker
Defendant: James - Walker
Petitioner: Abraham Banks
Case Number: 2:2007cv02022
Filed: September 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 1/15/2011 DENYING 30 Motion to Amend the Judgment and 31 Motion to Proceed IFP on appeal. (Zignago, K.)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 12/14/2010 ORDERING the petition is dismissed as untimely. Petitioner is not entitled to a certificate of appealability.CASE CLOSED.(Matson, R)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/09 ORDERING that Respondent's 15 request for a 30-day extension of time in which to file a reply in this matter is hereby GRANTED. Respondent's response is due on 4/22/09. (Duong, D)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/09 GRANTING 12 Request for extension of time. Respondents response is due on March 23, 2009.(Dillon, M)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/8/09 GRANTING 10 Request for extension of time. Respondents response is due on 2/5/09.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abraham Banks
Represented By: Mark David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James - Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?