Wartluft v. Feather River Community District
Plaintiff: Laurel Wartluft
Defendant: Feather River Community College District
Case Number: 2:2007cv02023
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/13 ORDERING that defendant is entitled to the following award of costs: 1. $6961.49 taxed against plaintiff Thein; 2. $10,357.25 taxed against plaintiff Jaureguito; and 3. $8933.53 taxed against plaintiff Wartluft. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/5/13 ORDERING that defendant's bill of costs is granted in part and denied in part as discussed in this order; defendant is directed to submit an amended bill of costs in conformance with this order within 21 days. (Kastilahn, A)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/2011 ORDERING 49 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART; Defendant's motion is granted as to plaintiffs' claims for unlawful retaliation in violation of Title IX and FEHA; the court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction as to the remaining state law claims; they are hereby DISMISSED with leave to refile in state court; and CASE CLOSED. (Waggoner, D)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/1/2010 GRANTING 41 Defendant's Ex Parte Application. The Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is SET 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Plaintiff's opposition is due by October 4, 2010 at 4:00 p.m., and defendant's reply is due by October 5, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference set for October 8, 2010 is VACATED and will be reset in the order on the motion. (Krueger, M)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/23/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Modify the Status Order is GRANTED in part. The court's 33 Pretrial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: Dispositive Motions are due by 7/2 3/2010, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr., Jury Trial set for 1/11/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. All other relevant deadlines are not extended. (Owen, K)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/20/2009 ORDERING that pursuant to the partie Stipulation the Court MODIFIES the Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/23/2009. Discovery due by 9/9/2009. Disposi tive Motions shall be heard by 1/15/2010. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 3/12/2010 at 02:00 PM, and the Jury Trial is RESET for 5/18/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. MOTION to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order 32 is TERMINATED and the hearing date of 5/29/09 is VACATED. (Krueger, M)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. on 10/01/07 ORDERING that this case be reassigned to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. and VACATING all dates in this case. The caption on all documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 07-cv-2023 FCD GGH. Clerk to issue an order requiring a joint status report for the undersigned and to make appropriate adjustment for this reassignment. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wartluft v. Feather River Community District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Wartluft
Represented By: Michael Anthony Terhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feather River Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?