USA v. Real Property Located at 24545 N. Suttenfield Road, Acampo, CA
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 24545 N. Suttenfield Road, Acampo, California
Case Number: 2:2007cv02114
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal 50 and Certificate of Reasonable Cause signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/6/11. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R) Modified on 4/11/2011 (Matson, R).
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/7/11 ORDERING discovery due by 7/1/11; designation of expert witnesses due by 5/1/2011; motions filed by 9/2/2011; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; Jury Trial set for 1/31/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Carlos, K)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2010 re 43 ORDERING that the Status Conference is RESET for 2/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The parties will file a joint status report by January 24, 2011 advising the court whether a further stay is necessary or addressing the matters in the March 14, 2008, Order Requiring Joint Status Report. (Duong, D)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER 41 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/10: This matter is STAYED pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 981(g)(1) and 981(g)(2) for a period of three months. The Status Conference is CONT'D to 12/13/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The paries shall file a joint status report by 12/6/10. (Kastilahn, A)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/8/09 ORDERING that this matter is stayed for a period of 6 months. The status conference scheduled for 9/21/09 is Vacated and Rescheduled to 3/22/10 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by 3/8/10. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Real Property Located at 24545 N. Suttenfield Road, Acampo, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 24545 N. Suttenfield Road, Acampo, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?