Castillo et al v. General Motors Corporation
Plaintiff: Kelly Castillo, Nichole Brown and Barbara Glisson
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv02142
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/13/11 ORDERING that this Action has been STAYED. The Clerk of Court is, therefore, instructed to administratively close this case, to be reopened upon the parties' notification to the Court of the termination of the bankruptcy action or relief from the automatic stay and order of this court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINAL JUDGMENT 71 entered pursuant to 73 Order filed on 4/14/2009. The Court has jurisdiction over subject matter of this litigation, and over all parties to litigation, including all members of proposed Class defined as all residents of the United States. (Marciel, M)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/22/09 GRANTING 58 Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Class Counsel. (Streeter, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Castillo
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Brown
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Glisson
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?