Rodgers v. Tilton et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodgers
Defendant: James Tilton, Suzan L. Hubbard, Moreno, R Wyant, R. Pettigrew, Whitten, R. L. Andreasen and Athanassious
Case Number: 2:2007cv02269
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/19/2013 ADOPTING 78 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 74 Motion to Withdraw Settlement Agreement and Re-open Proceedings. (Michel, G)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/13 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs April 5, 2012 motion to withdraw settlement agreement and re-open proceedings (Doc. No. 74 ) be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file a reply to defendants' 76 response to his motion to withdraw the settlement agreement and re-open these proceedings within 21 days. (Yin, K)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/08/12 ordering that defense counsel shall file a response to plaintiff's motion to withdraw the settlement agreement and re-open proceedings within 14 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/07/11 ordering the Custodian to produce Kevin Rodgers at 10/20/11 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the Custodian. (Plummer, M)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/1/2011 ORDERING that the Magistrate Judge's 63 Findings and Recommendations of July 8, 2011, be, and the same hereby are, adopted only to the extent they are consistent with this Order and Dr. Athanassious's 57 motion for summary judgment be, and same hereby is, GRANTED. (Duong, D)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/08/11 recommending that defendant Dr. Athanassious' motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part as follows: Defendant Dr. Athanassious' motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment inadequate medical care claim in connection with the medical care provided for his finger injury 57 be granted; and Defendant Dr. Athanassious' motion for summary judgment based on pla intiff's alleged failure to exhaust his administrative remedies with respect to his Eighth Amendment inadequate medical care claim in connection with his catheterization 57 be denied. Motion for Summary Judgment 57 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/08/10 plaintiff's 10/25/10 motion to compel 54 is denied without prejudice. Defendants 11/03/10 motion for a nunc pro tunc extension of time 55 is granted. Within 21 days of the date of this order, defendants shall respond to plaintiff's discovery requests. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/28/10 ORDERING that the 51 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full; Pltf's 43 Motion to Amend and 45 Motion to Vacate are DENIED. (Owen, K)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/10 ORDERING pltf's motion to re-open discovery 47 is GRANTED; dfts' motion to modify scheduling order 50 GRANTED; parties may conduct discovery until 10/29/10 and all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 2/25/11. (Carlos, K)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/03/10 ordering Discovery due by 6/4/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/27/2010. (Plummer, M)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/10 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 11/10/09, are adopted in full; and Dfts' 3/10/09 motion to dismiss 23 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Dfts' motion to dismiss against dft Pettigrew is denied; Dfts' motion to dismiss pltf's complaint against dfts Moreno, Whitten, Wyant; and against dft Pettigrew, aside from his Eighth Amendment claim, is granted; Dfts Moreno, Whitten, and Wyant are dismissed from this action; and Dfts Athanassious and Pettigrew are directed to file an answer to pltfs complaint w/i 30 days. (Becknal, R)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/01/09denying 36 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order in which to file objections to the 11/10/09 findings and recommendations. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/9/09 RECOMMENDING that 23 MOTION to DISMISS be granted in part and denied in part. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 20 days.(Dillon, M)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/7/2009 ORDERING that the 3/6/09 21 Order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Gaydosh, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzan L. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Wyant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Andreasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athanassious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?