USA v. Dubey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elwyn S Dubey, Jeannine M Dubey, Duane A Woodman, Val G. Bentley, Amador Martinez, Ed Sanderson, El Dorado Savings Bank and El Dorado County Tax Collector
Case Number: 2:2007cv02372
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/10/2015. All funds returned to Clerk in connections with Court's 156 Order shall be payable to "U.S. Department of Justice" and sent to: Department of Justice / ATTN: TAXFLU at P.O. Box - Ben Franklin Station in Washington, D.C. 20044. (Marciel, M)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/11/15 GRANTING 155 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. The sale on 3/12/15 was properly conducted. The sale is hereby confirmed. The Clerk shall disburse the proceeds of the sale in accordance with this order. (cc: Financial) (Manzer, C)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 AMENDED ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/11/2015. (cc: Financial) (Zignago, K.)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/13/15 GRANTING 149 Motion For Confirmation of Sale of Fair Pines Lane and Buckeye Court Properties. (Meuleman, A)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/15/2014 GRANTING 144 Motion for Confirmation of Sale; CONFIRMING the 6/30/2014 sale of the Del Oro Lane Property. (cc: Financial Sacramento) (Michel, G)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/2/2013; due to the elevation of District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Waggoner, D)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/14/10 ORDERING that Defendants' Motion to Stay Execution of order to sell property 134 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/3/10: 130 Motion For Counsel to Appear by telephone is GRANTED. Counsel for the United States may appear by phone at the hearing on the United States' Motion for Order of Judicial Sale scheduled for March 17, 2010, at 9:30 A.M. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JUDGMENT signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 08/28/09 ORDERING that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the United States and against Elwyn S. Dubey and Jeannine M. Dubey. The transfers of the property identified above from Elwyn S. Dubey and Jeanni ne M. Dubey are hereby SET ASIDE as fraudulent and VOID. The U.S. is entitled to enforce its tax and judgment liens against the subject property, which will be sold pursuant to further order of this Court. Judgment by default is hereby entered in favor of the U.S. and against Garden Valley Investments, which has no interest in the subject property. The U.S. may recover its costs of this action from Elwyn S. Dubey and Jeannine M. Dubey. (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/6/2009 DENYING 89 Motion to Dismiss for failure to serve necessary parties filed by Elwyn S. Dubey and Jeannine M. Dubey. (Reader, L)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States against Duane A. Woodman. (Engbretson, K.)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LIEN PRIORITY BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND EL DORADO COUNTY signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/10/09. (Kaminski, H)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/5/08 ORDERING that the Government has not shown that re-assignment of the later filed case "is likely to effect a savings of judicial effort or other economies." Therefore, that case will not be re-assigned. (Engbretson, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Dubey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elwyn S Dubey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannine M Dubey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane A Woodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val G. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amador Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Guy Patrick Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?