Walker v. Karles
Plaintiff: Charles E. Walker
Defendant: Karles
Case Number: 2:2007cv02545
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/01/11 granting 75 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/04/11 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Charles E. Walker at February 28, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 7 before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/05/10 ordering plaintiff shall file a written statement within 28 days of the date of this order as to why the court should not impose sanctions on him for his failure to respond to the court' s 08/26/10 order. Plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement on or before 10/29/10; plaintiff is further cautioned that in light of his delay as set forth above, no further extensions of time shall be granted for this purpose and that his failure to file and serve a proper pretrial statement will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed.(Plummer, M)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/09/10 ORDERING the custodian to produce Charles E. Walker at 9:00 a.m. on 10/18/10 in courtroom 7 before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/3/10 GRANTING 63 Motion to Modify the scheduling order to the extent it seeks additional time to file defendant's pre-trial statement and DENIED with respect to the request to continue the trial date. Defense counsel shall file defendant's pre-trial statement on or before 9/17/2010. Defense counsel is cautioned that no further extensions of time will be granted for this purpose. (Donati, J)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/10 ORDERING that Plaintiffs 55 motion for assistance in preparing his pretrial statement is denied; Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of Local Rule 281 and a copy of the courts 44 scheduling order; Plaintiffs 57 motion to correct the scheduling order is denied as having been rendered moot; and Plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement on or before 9/13/10. (Dillon, M)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/19/2010 ORDERING that, w/in 14 days, pltf to file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. (Yin, K)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/08/10. (Plummer, M)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/22/09 DENYING 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve process on A. Karales signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/5/08 that the clerk is directed to forward plaintiff's instructions for service, the completed summons, copies of the complaint and this order to th e USM. The Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with Local Rules of the Court. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect that defendant's name is spelled A. Karales. (cc: USM Priority) (Attachments: # 1 Local Rules)(Anderson, J) Modified on 2/27/2008 (Anderson, J).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Karles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?