Jones v. Frazesn et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Bernard Jones
Defendant: S Frazesn, D Easterling, D Dudder, S - Bess, T. Ayers and R Solorzano
Case Number: 2:2007cv02758
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 9/3/10 ORDERING Plaintiff's Motion 72 for Relief from Dismissal or Court Order is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
July 8, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman ORDERING dfts to file a response to pltf's Motion for Relief from Dismissal 72 ; briefing is due within 21 days of the date of this order. (Carlos, K)
April 14, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 04/13/10 DENYING 55 Motion for Reconsideration. (Williams, D)
January 14, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 1/13/10 ORDERING that Defendants have 35 days from the date of this order to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court shall send uncertified copies of this Order to Show Cause to Plaintiff at his address of record and by electronic notice to Defendants counsel. (Becknal, R)
October 8, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dated *10/8/2009* pursuant to order signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 10/8/2009. (Matson, R)
August 31, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 8/31/2009 GRANTING defendants' 39 Ex Parte Application and they may file a Discovery Motion w/in 1 week of this Order. All Pre-Trial Motions shall be filed on or before 9/18/2009. Plaintiff s hall file and serve his Pretrial Statement and any Motion necessary to obtain attendance of witnesses at Trial on or before 10/2/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2009 and shall be conducted on file only. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (TBD) on the 15th Floor. (Marciel, M)
August 14, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard C. Tallman on 08/13/09 ORDERING that plf's 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Frazesn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Bernard Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Frazesn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Dudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S - Bess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Solorzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?