Leyva v. Moreno et al

Plaintiff: Joseph M. Leyva
Defendant: Moreno, Howard, - Gauthreaux, Martin, Murillo, - Purdy and R. Mandeville
Case Number: 2:2008cv00076
Filed: January 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/11 recommending that defendant's 04/28/11 motion for summary judgment 53 be granted; and plaintiff's 05/11/11 motion for witnesses at trial 55 be denied as moot. Motion for Summary Judgment 53 and MOTION for Witnesses at Trial 55 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/2/11 DENYING 51 Motion to Compel. (Dillon, M)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 8/15/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of time 64 is DENIED as MOOT; Defendant's MOTION to MODIFY the Scheduling Order 65 is GRANTED; and The 10/22/10 Scheduling Order 42 is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/8/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 46 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED; and counsel for dft is requested to facilitate pltf's prompt access to his central file. (Yin, K)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to conduct plaintiff's deposition by video conference signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/19/10. Nothing in this order shall be interpreted as requiring the institution in which plaintiff is housed to obtain video-conferencing equipment if it is not already available. (Plummer, M)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/31/10, ADOPTING IN FULL 39 the findings and recommendations; and Dft's motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/22/10 RECOMMENDING that the 31 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Owen, K)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/23/10. (Plummer, M)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/09 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/24/09 RECOMMENDING that the 14 motion to dismiss be granted for failure to state a claim re 14th and 8th Amendment claims against dft Mandeville; the motion to dismiss be denied w/out prejudice re failure to exhaust adminstrative remedies; and the motion to dismiss be denied re retaliation cause of action for failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due w/in 20 days. (Yin, K)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/14/09 GRANTING 20 Request for extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a response to defendants 12/3/08 motion to dismiss; and plaintiffs 19 request for the issuance of an order to show cause is denied. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leyva v. Moreno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Gauthreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?