Holdman v. Hedgepath
Petitioner: Jason Tyrone Holdman
Respondent: Anthony Hedgepath
Case Number: 2:2008cv00183
Filed: January 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/4/13 DENYING 76 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Manzer, C)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/07/13 ordering that petitioner is granted up and until 02/15/13 in which to file objections to the 10/15/12 findings and recommendations. (Plummer, M)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/2012 ORDERING the Clerk to substitute Tim Virga as respondent in the docket of this action; and RECOMMENDING that the 37 petition for writ of habeas corpus be DENIED in its entirety; Claim 1 on the merits and Claims 2 and 3 as procedurally barred; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/19/11. (Plummer, M)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/1/2010 ORDERING that ptnr's 23 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED; and ptnr's 24 request for an extension of time is DENIED. (Yin, K)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/12/09 ORDERING that petitioners application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Respondent is directed to file a response to petitioners amended habeas petition within 60 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order together with a copy of the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus filed 9/26/08 on Michael Patrick Farrell. (cc Michael Farrell)(Dillon, M)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/8/08. Petitioner shall submit, w/in 30 days from date of Order, an Affidavit in support of Request to Proceed IFP or appropriate filing fee. Clerk directed to send petitioner a copy of IFP form. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holdman v. Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Tyrone Holdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?