Haff v. People of The State of California et al
Petitioner: Matthew David Haff
Respondent: People of The State of California and Attorney General for the State of California
Case Number: 2:2008cv00294
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/7/09 ORDERING that the 21 findings and recommendations filed July 10, 2009, are adopted in full. Respondent's 5 motion to dismiss, filed on April 3, 2008, is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/10/09 ORDERING that the record is expanded to include the declarations and documents discussed in this motion; RECOMMENDING that 5 Motion to Dismiss be granted and this case be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 20 days.(Dillon, M)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/3/09 ORDERING that the FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS filed 12/15/08 12 are remanded back to the Magistrate Judge. Petitioner is GRANTED 10 days from service of this order to respond with evidence to Respondent's Objections. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haff v. People of The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew David Haff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?