Grant v. Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Eric Grant alleged that he represented Doe plaintiffs in John Doe, a minor, by his mother and next friend, Jane Doe v. Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, et al. Plaintiff Grant further alleged that after his clients signed a settlement agreement with Defendant Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, Plaintiff's co-counsel John Goemans disclosed certain terms of the settlement agreement in breach of the agreement's confidentiality provisions. Plaintiff Grant now seeks a declaratory judgment that he is not liable to Defendant Kamehameha Schools because John Goemans allegedly disclosed confidential information in breach of the settlement agreement.

Plaintiff: Eric Grant
Defendant: Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune and Corbett A.K. Kalama
Case Number: 2:2008cv00672
Filed: March 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2008 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii case number CV 08-00555 DAE LEK. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2008 Filing 98 ELECTRONIC TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS to District of Hawaii (TEXT ONLY ENTRY). (Waggoner, D)
November 17, 2008 Filing 97 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS re 96 Order Case Transferred Out to Another District on *11/17/2008* to * District of Hawaii* *300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C 338* *Honolulu, HI 96850*. ** *Electronic Documents: 1 to 96. *. (Benson, A)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 11/17/08 ORDERING that the Estate dfts' 50 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; the Estate dfts' 77 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED; plf's pending 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Hawaii. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED.(Benson, A)
November 14, 2008 Filing 95 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT Third Amended Notice by Eric Grant. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Banks, James)
October 27, 2008 Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/27/08: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 50 , and Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the District of Hawaii 77 are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. The hearing date of 10/31/08 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written order. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M)
October 24, 2008 Filing 93 REPLY by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama to RESPONSE to 50 Motion to Dismiss. (Alston, Paul)
October 24, 2008 Filing 92 REPLY by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama to RESPONSE to 77 Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Alston, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Alston, Paul)
October 20, 2008 Filing 91 OPPOSITION by Eric Grant to 50 Motion to Dismiss. Amended to correct Table of Authorities only (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Non-Standard Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Eric Grant)(Grant, Eric)
October 17, 2008 Filing 90 OPPOSITION by Eric Grant to 77 Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Non-Standard Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Eric Grant, # 3 Declaration of James J. Banks)(Grant, Eric)
October 17, 2008 Filing 89 OPPOSITION by Eric Grant to 50 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Non-Standard Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Eric Grant)(Grant, Eric)
October 17, 2008 Filing 88 APPENDIX of Unpublished Cases in support of 86 Opposition by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Farmer Decision, # 2 In Re Yahoo Decision, # 3 Jarvis Decision, # 4 Pralinsky, # 5 Sec. & Exch. Comm'n Decision, # 6 U-Haul Decision, # 7 Unisys Decision)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A). Modified on 10/24/2008 (Engbretson, K.).
October 17, 2008 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Jerry H. Stein in support of 86 Opposition. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A). Modified on 10/24/2008 (Engbretson, K.).
October 17, 2008 Filing 86 OPPOSITION by Jane Doe, John Doe to 77 Motion to Transfer. (Stein, Jerry)
October 17, 2008 Filing 85 APPENDIX of Unpublished Cases in support of 84 Opposition by Jane Doe, John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bou-Matic Decision, # 2 Exhibit J.G. Boswell Tomato Co. Decision, # 3 Exhibit Lenscrafters Decision)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A).
October 17, 2008 Filing 84 OPPOSITION by Jane Doe, John Doe to 50 Motion to Dismiss. (Stein, Jerry)
October 10, 2008 Filing 83 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on 81 Motion for Summary Judgment by Eric Grant. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/08 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. (Banks, James) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A).
October 10, 2008 Filing 82 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on 81 Motion for Summary Judgment by Eric Grant. Motion Hearing set for 12/05/08 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. (Banks, James) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A).
October 3, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Eric Grant. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/08 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Non-Standard Authorities, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Declaration of Eric Grant, # 4 Declaration of James J. Banks, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Grant, Eric) Modified on 10/17/2008 (Benson, A).
August 29, 2008 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama in SUPPORT of 50 MOTION to DISMISS. SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Alston, # 2 Exhibit 25)(Alston, Paul)
August 28, 2008 Filing 79 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama in re 77 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. in Support of Motion to Transfer to District of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Alston, Paul)
August 22, 2008 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Louise K. Y. Ing in Support of 77 Motion to Transfer to District of Hawaii. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ing, Louise) Modified on 8/25/2008 (Benson, A).
August 22, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Transfer to District of Hawaii by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/08 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Paul Alston)(Alston, Paul) Modified on 8/25/2008 (Benson, A).
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/18/08: Added attorney Louise K.Y. Ing, PHV for Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Carlos, K)
July 18, 2008 Filing 74 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama for attorney Louise K. Y. Ing to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Shimada, Charlene)
July 18, 2008 RECEIPT number #CAE200008800 $180.00 for Pro Hac Vice fbo Defendants Kamehameha Schools et al by Louise K.Y. Ing on 7/18/2008. (Reader, L)
July 16, 2008 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/16/08: The parties filed a Joint Status Report on May 14, 2008 as required by the Court's Order Requiring a Joint Status Report. However, in light of the pending Motion to Dismiss set for hearing on October 31, 2008, the Court will defer scheduling of this action. The Court will request that the parties file a new Joint Status Report, if necessary, within 30 days after the issuance of an order on the Motion. The Court will then issue a Pretrial Scheduling Order. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M)
July 14, 2008 Filing 72 SEALED EVENT (Carlos, K)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/14/08 ORDERING Defendants MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements 65 GRANTED. Exhibits 23 and 24 to the Declaration of Paul Alston shall be filed under SEAL. (Krueger, M)
July 11, 2008 Filing 70 PROPOSED ORDER re 65 MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements. (Alston, Paul)
July 10, 2008 Filing 69 NOTICE of Manual Filing; Proof of Service by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 68 PROPOSED ORDER re 65 MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 67 NOTICE of Filing Sealed Documents in Hard Copy Only by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama re 65 MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Paul Alston in Support of 65 MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements. (Wadsworth, Clyde) [DECLARATION NOT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL] Modified on 7/11/2008 (Krueger, M).
July 9, 2008 Filing 65 MOTION to SEAL Confidential Agreements by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 64 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)(Documents received and routed to the fileroom) Modified on 7/10/2008 (Matson, R).
July 9, 2008 Filing 63 APPENDIX by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama re 50 MOTION to DISMISS filed by J. Douglas Ing, Corbett A.K. Kalama, Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Nainoa Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22)(Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 62 PROPOSED ORDER re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 61 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama in re 50 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 18)(Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Dee Jay A. Mailer in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Brad Santiago in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Constance Lau in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 57 DECLARATION of J. Douglas Ing in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Robert K.U. Kihune in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Diane J. Plotts in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Nainoa Thompson in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Corbett A.K. Kalama in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Paul Alston in Support of re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 24)(Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in SUPPORT re 50 MOTION to DISMISS. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
July 9, 2008 Filing 50 MOTION to DISMISS by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/08 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/08 AMENDING 43 Order.(Dillon, M)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/9/2008 GRANTING 47 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond and for Additional Pages; KS shall file its motions to dismiss Grants Complaint and the Does Cross-Claim on or before 7/9/2008 and the page limit for KS opening brief and Grants and the Does oppositions shall be 25 pages and the page limit for KS consolidated reply brief shall be 20 pages. (Matson, R)
June 6, 2008 Filing 47 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond and for Additional Pages by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
May 30, 2008 Filing 46 STIPULATION Protective Order by Jane Doe, Eric Grant, John Doe, Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
May 14, 2008 Filing 45 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
May 7, 2008 Filing 44 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. Attorney Wadsworth, Clyde James added. (Wadsworth, Clyde)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING NONDISCLOSURE 42 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/24/08. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 23, 2008 Filing 42 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Nondisclosure by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
April 23, 2008 Filing 41 ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM of Defendants John Doe and Jane Doe by Eric Grant. Attorney Grant, Eric added.(Grant, Eric)
April 17, 2008 Filing 40 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr: MOTION HEARING on Defendant Does Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 4/17/2008. The Parties Stipulate that Defendants will not disclose the identity of the Doe parties, unless so ordered by the Court. Counsel for Defendants is to file a Proposed Stipulation and Order. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 7 filed by Doe Defendants TERMINATED. Plaintiffs Counsel James Banks present. Defendants Counsel Paul Alston, Robert Brundage, and Charlene Shimada; Counsel Jerry Stein for Doe Defendants present. Court Reporter: Michelle Babbitt. (Krueger, M)
April 17, 2008 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER re 11 Statement GRANTING PRELMINARY INJUNCTION (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/23/2008 (Dillon, M).
April 16, 2008 Filing 38 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Ken T. Kuniyuki in SUPPORT OF 11 Statement (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/17/2008 (Benson, A).
April 15, 2008 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Jerry H. Stein in SUPPORT OF 11 Statement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit: Sales Transaction, # 2 Exhibit E-Mail from Alston)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/16/2008 (Benson, A).
April 15, 2008 Filing 36 REPLY by Plaintiff to KSBE Defendants' Opposition to Doe Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Grant)(Grant, Eric) Modified on 4/16/2008 (Benson, A).
April 15, 2008 Filing 35 DECLARATION of KEN T. KUNIYUKI in SUPPORT OF re 11 Statement - R. (Stein, Jerry)
April 15, 2008 Filing 34 REPLY 28 Opposition to TRO by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/16/2008 (Benson, A).
April 15, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Letter to the Court by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
April 14, 2008 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER Denying John and Jane Doe's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
April 14, 2008 Filing 31 APPENDIX by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. in Support of Kamehameha Schools Defendants' Opposition to John and Jane Doe's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Shimada, Charlene)
April 14, 2008 Filing 30 DECLARATION of David Schulmeister in SUPPORT OF. Kamehameha Schools Defendants' Opposition to John and Jane Doe's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shimada, Charlene)
April 14, 2008 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Colleen I. Wong in SUPPORT OF Kamehameha Schools Defendants' 28 Opposition (Shimada, Charlene) Modified on 4/15/2008 (Dillon, M).
April 14, 2008 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to John and Jane Doe's 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Shimada, Charlene) Modified on 4/15/2008 (Dillon, M).
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 04/11/08. The time for defendants/cross-defendants to file its opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction filed by defendants/cross-claimants John Doe and Jane Doe no later than Monday, 4/14/08 at 4:00 p.m. (Price, M)
April 11, 2008 Filing 26 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Oppose Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Shimada, Charlene)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/10/08. Added attorney Paul Alston, PHV for Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, and Corbett A.K. Kalama. (Yin, K)
April 10, 2008 RECEIPT number # CAE200006258 of $180.00 for Pro Hac Vice Application of attorney Paul Alston by Charlene Shimada. (Marciel, M)
April 9, 2008 Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama for attorney Paul Alston to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Shimada, Charlene Sachi added. (Shimada, Charlene)
April 9, 2008 Filing 22 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by Jane Doe, John Doe. Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate waiver sent on 4/8/2008, answer due 6/9/2008; J. Douglas Ing waiver sent on 4/8/2008, answer due 6/9/2008; Diane J. Plotts waiver sent on 4/8/2008, answer due 6/9/2008; Robert K.U. Kihune waiver sent on 4/8/2008, answer due 6/9/2008; Corbett A.K. Kalama waiver sent on 4/8/2008, answer due 6/9/2008. (Stein, Jerry)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 04/07/08. The parties are enjoined and restrained during the pendency of this action from directly or indirectly disclosing the identities of the Does unless and until otherwise permitted by this Court in order to effectuate a writ of attachment or other order issued by this Court. Hearing on Prelim. Inj. set for 4/17/08 at 4:00 p.m. Any opposition to be filed by 4:00 p.m. on 4/11/08 and any reply by 4:00 p.m. on 4/15/08. No bond is required. (Price, M)
April 7, 2008 Filing 20 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr: MOTION HEARING held on 4/7/2008 re Doe defts 7 Motion for TRO.- GRANTED. Written order to follow. No bond shall be posted. Hearing for Preliminary Injunction set for 4/17/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Plaintiffs Counsel James Banks present. Defendants Counsel Doe defts - Jerry Stein present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Laurie Howard. (Price, M)
April 4, 2008 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jerry H. Stein in SUPPORT OF re 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-Mail to LaPorte, # 2 Exhibit of Notification of Receipt)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/9/2008 (Matson, R).
April 4, 2008 Filing 18 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION to Motion for Temporary Rrotective Order. Attorney Banks, James Joseph added. (Banks, James) Modified on 4/9/2008 (Matson, R).
April 4, 2008 Filing 17 AMENDED DECLARATION of Ken T. Kuniyuki in SUPPORT OF 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/9/2008 (Matson, R).
April 3, 2008 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: from CRD M. Price for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 04/03/08. 7 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER set for Hearing on 4/7/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Any Opposition to the motion shall be filed no later than 3:00 p.m. on Friday, 4/4/08 and any reply, not to exceed 7 pages, to be filed by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, 4/7/08 (Price, M)
April 3, 2008 Filing 15 AMENDED (Ex Parte) 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Yin, K).
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 4/3/08 ORDERING that attorney Ken T. Kuniyuki Added PHV for Jane Doe and John Doe. (Donati, J)
April 3, 2008 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM and CROSS-CLAIM against all parties by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Stein, Jerry)
April 3, 2008 Filing 12 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Stein, Jerry)
April 3, 2008 Filing 11 STATEMENT of TRO CHECKLIST by Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe re 7 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (Stein, Jerry)
April 3, 2008 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER granting 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Yin, K).
April 3, 2008 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Jane Doe in SUPPORT OF 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Parties' agreement, # 2 Exhibit Temporary Protective Order against Goemans, # 3 Exhibit Honolulu Advertiser Article)(Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Yin, K).
April 3, 2008 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Ken T. Kuniyuki in SUPPORT OF 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Yin, K).
April 3, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Stein, Jerry) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Yin, K).
April 2, 2008 RECEIPT number CAE200005990 for $180.00 from Kuniyuki and Chang for attorney Ken Kuniyuki to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Carlos, K)
April 1, 2008 Filing 6 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jane Doe, John Doe, Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Eric Grant* *Attorney at Law* *8001 Folsom Blvd., Ste. 100* *Sacramento, CA 95826*. (Benson, A)
April 1, 2008 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Jane Doe, John Doe for attorney Ken T. Kuniyuki to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stein, Jerry H. added. (Stein, Jerry)
March 31, 2008 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms, # 2 VDRP Forms) (Benson, A)
March 31, 2008 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate, J. Douglas Ing, Nainoa Thompson, Diane J. Plotts, Robert K.U. Kihune, Corbett A.K. Kalama* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Eric Grant* *801 Folsom Blvd., Ste. 100* *Sacramento, CA 95826*. (Benson, A)
March 31, 2008 RECEIPT number #CAE200005885 $350.00 fbo Eric Grant by Eric Grant on 3/31/2008. (Benson, A)
March 28, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against all defendants by Eric Grant. Attorney Grant, Eric added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grant, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Grant
Represented By: Eric Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamehameha Schools/Bernice Pauahi Bishop Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Douglas Ing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nainoa Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane J. Plotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K.U. Kihune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbett A.K. Kalama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?