International Raelian Movement v. Hashem

Plaintiff: International Raelian Movement
Defendant: Abdullah Hashem, Joseph McGowen, Dragonslayer Productions, Hashem(s) Films and Muslims United TV
Case Number: 2:2008cv00687
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT against defendants Abdullah Hashem and Hashem(s) Films (Marciel, M)
August 25, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/11 Recommending that Plaintiff's Amended Second MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT 53 be granted. An order for replevin be entered requiring defaulted defendants Abdullah H ashem and Hashem(s) Films to return to Plaintiff International Raelian Movement the film footage described in Plaintiff's complaint within 30 days after default judgment is entered against these defendants. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Within fourteen days after service of these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and shall serve a copy of the objections on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/28/2010 ORDERING 47 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; 38 Motion for Default Judgment is denied without prejudice; and plaintiff is granted 45 days to file a second motion for default judgment. (Matson, R)
September 1, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/01/10 ORDERING the Clerk to serve a courtesy copy of this Order by mail on Jonahtan H. Levy, Esq.; RECOMMENDING that 38 Motion for Default be DENIED; Motion referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (cc: Jonathan H. Levy, Esq.) (Williams, D) Modified on 9/1/2010 Modified on 9/1/2010 (Manzer, C).
December 8, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/7/09: Hearing as to 38 Motion for Default Judgment RESET for 1/29/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Kaminski, H)
October 26, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/09 ORDERING that pursuant to Local Rule 72-302(c)(21), this action is referred back to theassigned district judge for further proceedings, and the docket shall be modified to reflect that this c ase is not a Pro Se case; All documents hereafter submitted for filing in the case shall bear case number Civ. S-08-0687 FCD DAD or 2:08-cv-0687 FCD DAD; and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order filed 3/23/09 25 and all dates set therein, including Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/10 before the undersigned and Jury Trial set for 4/6/10 before the assigned district judge, are vacated. (Becknal, R)
July 15, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/15/09 ORDERING pltf's Motion for Alternative Service pursuant to FRCP 4(f)(3) 26 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. (Carlos, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Raelian Movement v. Hashem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Raelian Movement
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdullah Hashem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McGowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragonslayer Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashem(s) Films
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muslims United TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?