Brooks v. Sisto, et al

Petitioner: Gordon Brooks
Respondent: D. K. Sisto and Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2008cv00862
Filed: April 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/21/2011 ORDERING that petitioner's 28 January 14, 2011 motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied at this time, without prejudice to its renewal upon submission of petitioner's trust fund account statement.(Duong, D)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 10/18/10 ORDERING petitioner's request for extension of time 20 is GRANTED and petitioner has until 11/16/10 in which to file objections to the findings and recommendations. (Carlos, K)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 9/21/10, RECOMMENDING that the petition for writ of hc be DENIED. Case referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Within 21 days after being served with these f&r's, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Sisto, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gordon Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?