Buena Vista Biomass Development, LLC v Oneta Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Buena Vista Biomass Development, LLC
Defendant: Oneta Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01011
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 49 for further extension of stay signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/15/2009. All litigation activities in case are STAYED until 10/19/2009. All deadlines in Court's previously Scheduling Order shall be SUSPENDED until further notice from Court. (Marciel, M)
September 1, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/31/09 ORDERING that all litigation activities in this case are STAYED until 9/14/09. All deadlines in the Court's previous Scheduling Orders, including deadlines for completing discovery, filing expert witness disclosures and filing dispositive motions and motions in limine, shall be suspended until further notice from the Court. The parties shall notify the Court by 9/14/09 of the status of their negotiations and closing on the Purchase and Sale Agreement.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 13, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 45 for further extension of stay of litigation signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/2009. All activities in this case are STAYED until 8/31/2009 and all deadlines in Court's previous Scheduling Orders shall be SUSPENDED until further notice. Parties shall notify Court by 8/31/2009 of status of their negotiations and closing on purchase and sale agreement. (Marciel, M)
August 5, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/4/09: The parties shall notify the Court by August 11, 2009 of the status of their negotiations and closing on the Purchase and Sale Agreement. By August 11, 2009 the parties shall submit a written report to the Court regarding the status of the transaction. (Kaminski, H)
February 5, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR STAY OF LITIGATION ACTIVITIES AND EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL DEADLINES and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 02/05/09 ORDERING that all litigation activities shall be STAYED for 30 days; that all pretrial deadlines are EXTENDED by 30 days as follows: Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 03/29/09 and heard by 04/22/09 at 9:00 a.m.; all discovery shall be completed by 03/18/09; all expert witness disclosures are due by 03/18/09 with any supplemental/rebuttal due by 03/25/09. All remaining deadline and date remain unchanged. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buena Vista Biomass Development, LLC v Oneta Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buena Vista Biomass Development, LLC
Represented By: John Edward Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneta Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?