Wessel v. Sisto et al
Petitioner: David Wessel
Respondent: D.K. Sisto, Board of Parole Hearings and Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2008cv01082
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/18/11. (Kaminski, H)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/30/10: Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. (Kaminski, H)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 12/7/10, RECOMMENDING that the application for writ of hc be DENIED. Matter referred to Judge Shubb. Within 21 days after being served with these f&r's, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be served and filed within seven days after service of the objections. (Kastilahn, A)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/09 ORDERING that 10 Motion for Discovery is DENIED; 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; 8 Motion to Stay is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This action is stayed until the date the Ninth Circuits en banc decision in Hayward v.Marshall is announced. The respondent shall have 60 days from that date in which to file an answer to the petition.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wessel v. Sisto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.K. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Parole Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?