Vasquez vs. Commissioner of SSA

Plaintiff: Marcella Vasquez
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 2:2008cv01227
Filed: June 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/29/2010 ORDERING that Pltf's 23 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Dft's 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/15/10 ORDERING that the Court's 21 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED pursuant to pltf's 7/22/10 dispositive 23 Motion filing. (Owen, K)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file a dispositive Motion. Plaintiff is again warned that failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/30/10: The Plaintiff's time to file the summary judgment in this case is hereby extended from April 21, 2010, to May 21, 2010. (Kaminski, H)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/03/10 ORDERING that plf's time to file the summary judgment motion is EXTENDED to 04/21/10. (Benson, A.)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER 14 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2010. Plaintiff' time to file Summary Judgment is extended to 2/26/2010. (Marciel, M) Modified on 1/22/2010 (Marciel, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez vs. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Vasquez
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?