Harris v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Harris
Defendant: James Walker, S. Williamson, T. Hronek, O. Moreno and C. Igbokwe
Case Number: 2:2008cv01615
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/28/2010 RECOMMENDING that dfts' unopposed 55 motion to dismiss be granted. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 22, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/22/2009 ORDERING that pltf's response to dft's 55 Motion to Dismiss is due within 30 days. (Suttles, J) Modified on 10/27/2009 (Manzer, C).
August 28, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/27/09 denying 53 second motion to disqualify. (Plummer, M)
August 6, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/05/09 denying motion for default judgment construed as a request for entry of default 48 and denying plaintiff's motion to disqualify counsel 46 . (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/27/09 ORDERING that pltf's 27 , 29 motions to compel are DENIED as premature; pltf's 28 , 30 , 31 , and 32 discovery requests are STRICKEN; pltf's 33 , 34 , 35 , 36 , 37 , 38 , 39 , and 40 are DISREGARDED; and the clerk to terminate all pending motions.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hronek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Igbokwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?