Swenson v. Siskiyou County et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Swenson
Defendant: Siskiyou County, California, Siskiyou County Planning Commission, LaVada Erickson, Frank Demarco, Don Langford, Bill Hoy, Marci Armstrong, Jim Cook, Ron Stevens, Jeff Fowle, Chris Lazaris, Mike McMahon, Bryan McDermot, Larry Allen and Pete Knoll
Case Number: 2:2008cv01675
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Siskiyou
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/02/16 ORDERING that the 02/09/16 trial and all related deadlines are VACATED and STAYED pending the completion of plaintiff's pursuit of administrative processes and proc edures in Siskiyou County; the parties will notify the court within 14 days of the conclusion of the administrative processes and proceedings to advise whether the matter has been resolved and the case may be dismissed, or to set the matter for trial. (Benson, A)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/28/15: Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury trial is on standby for November 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom Three before the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on November 14, 2014. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 174 is DENIED. (Rivas, A)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/7/2014 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is set for 6/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. At least seven calendar days before the settlement conference, c ounsel for each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement using the following email address: dadorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Each party shall serve notice on all other parties that the statement has been submitted. (Zignago, K.)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/22/2014. Judge Mendez is RECUSED and District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is ASSIGNED for all further proceedings. All pending dated before Judge Mendez are VACATED. Future documents filed in action shall be denominated 2:08-CV-1675 KJM CMK. (Marciel, M)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/17/14 ORDERING that the parties agree to complete percipient witness depositions by 3/25/14; depositions for Earl Campbell, Fern Campbell and Tony Cruse by 4/25/14. (Manzer, C)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/31/14 re: 167 for Dismissal of Defendants Larry Allen, Pete Knoll, Brian McDermott, and Don Langford. Larry Allen, Pete Knoll, Bryan McDermot, and Don Langford DISMISSED with prejudice. (Meuleman, A)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/30/14: The deadline to complete certain percipient witness depositions and expert depositions reset to March 14, 2014. Defendants time to respond to currently outstanding written discovery extended to February 14, 2014. The time for defendants to respond to the written discovery shall be extended to February 14, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheudling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/29/13: All dispositive motions, not previously addressed by this Court or the Ninth Circuit Court of appeals shall be filed by 4/9/2014. Hearing on such motions shall be on 5/7/2 014 at 9:30 a.m.. All discovery shall be completed by 2/14/2014. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/13/2013 and supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts due by 12/20/2013. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 6/18/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is SET for 7/28/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately 10 to 14 days. (Kastilahn, A)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/25/2013 ORDERING pursuant to Eastern District of California Local Rules, this matter is no longer a referred pro se civil case; the status conference set before the undersigned is hereby VACATED and the matter is returned to the assigned District Judge for further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/7/13 ORDERING that on 6/15/11 the court entered final judgment. Plaintiff appealed and, on 11/20/12, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued an unpublished memorandum disposition affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding the matter for further proceedings. The appellate court's mandate issued on 4/15/13, returned jurisdiction to this court. A status/scheduling conference is hereby set before the undersigned on 6/26/13, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Redding, California.(Becknal, R)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/4/11 RECOMMENDING pltf's Motion to Strike 111 be denied and dfts' request for judicial notice 74 be granted; REFERRED to Judge Frank C. Damrell; objections due within 14 days after being served with these F&R's. (Carlos, K)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 100 Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/16/10. (Duong, D)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/2/10 ORDERING pltf's oppostion to dfts' motion for summary judgment 74 is due within 30 days of the date of this order and dfts' reply is due within 14 days after service of pltf's opposition. (Carlos, K)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/22/2010 ORDERING that the 8/12/2010 motion hearing is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 06/24/10 DENYING 66 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING 68 Motion for Reconsideration. (Williams, D)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/26/10 ORDERING that dfts' 57 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is GRANTED; for Discovery; dfts are AWARDED monetary sanctions in the amount of $590.00 as reasonable expenses incurred in bringing their motion; plf shall pay the sanctions to dfts' counsel w/i 30 days of the date of this order. (Benson, A.)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/20/2010 ORDERING that plaintiff's 48 motion is DENIED except as to the request for an extension of the discovery cut-off date, which was addressed by prior order.(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swenson v. Siskiyou County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County Planning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaVada Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Demarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Fowle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lazaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan McDermot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?