James v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: Charles Cornelius James
Defendant: Suzan Hubbard, N. Grantis, Mike Knowles, Anthony Freese and R. Benton
Case Number: 2:2008cv01857
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 11/22/2013 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); each party shall bear its own litigation costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER and WRIT ISSUED signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 10/3/13 ORDERING the custodian to produce inmate Charles C. James in court on November 21, 2013 at 9:00 am before Judge Craig M. Kellison. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc OTCD)(Dillon, M)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER and WRIT ISSUED signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 10/3/13 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Charles C. James in Courtroom 9 on November 21, 2013 at 9:00 am. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custofy of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc OTCD)(Dillon, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 10/1/13 REFERRING this matter to the Court's Prisoner Settlement Program for mediation with Magistrate Judge Kellison. Within 10 days after the conclusion of the mediation, Magistrate Judge Ke llison shall file a report with the Court regarding the mediation. If the mediation does not resolve this matter in full, the parties may file dispositive motions within 30 days of the medication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings are STAYED pending the results of mediation. Case stayed (Case Management Deadline: 4/3/2014), Case Referred to VDRP. (cc: CMK). (Meuleman, A)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 8/2/13: Dispositive Motions are due on or before by 10/1/2013. (Kaminski, H)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 6/4/13 GRANTING the parties' stipulation to extend the deadline for filing dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions due 8/2/2013. (Meuleman, A)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 10/31/12 ORDERING that Defendants Perez and Mandeville's motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 4/3/12 ORDERING that 45 the stipulation for dismissal of all claims against Mehta in this action, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and E.D. Local Rule 143, is APPROVED. James' claims against Mehta in this action are DISMISSED and Mehta's 39 motion to dismiss is dismissed as moot. (Kastilahn, A)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 02/02/12 GRANTING 40 Motion for Extension of Time; defendants' reponsive pleading is due 02/29/12. (Benson, A.)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 5/27/2011 re 30 ORDERING that plaintiff's claims against dft Hubbard for violation of his Eighth Amendment rights are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff shall file a Fifth Amended Complaint with these claims removed, and no other changes, within 10 days. After review of the Fifth Amended Complaint, this Court shall issue further orders regarding service of the complaint.(Duong, D)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 11/22/10 ORDERING that the 21 Third Amended Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim; plf to file a fourth amended complaint w/i 40 days; Clerk to send plf proper civil rights form; plf's 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED; the King Hall Civil Rights Clinic is APPOINTED as counsel for plf. (Attachments: # 1 civil rights complaint form)(Benson, A.)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Extension signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 10/15/2009. (Matson, R)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Circuit Judge Richard R. Clifton on 9/10/2009 ORDERING the second amended complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim; Pltf has 30 days to file a third amended complaint and if pltf fails to file a third amended complaint, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action w/prejudice that states the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915; and the Clerk must include a copy of a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cornelius James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?