Stevens v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Jordan Stevens
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv01903
Filed: August 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TRIAL SCHEDULE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/20/11 ORDERING that this communication responds to inquiries about the trial schedule in this case, which is as follows: trial commences at 9:00 a.m.on Tuesday, Wednesday, and Thursday of each week, and usually adjourns at approximately 4:30 p.m. However, once the jury begins deliberating counsel shall be available for communication with the jury during the above mentioned time Monday through Friday.(Becknal, R)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/12/11 ORDERING Homer Fagan's claim against defendant is dismissed with prejudice.(Matson, R)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/14/10 ORDERING that the trial is continued to 5/3/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Owen, K)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/11/2010 ORDERING 24 Defendant's argument challenges Darnell's credibility rather than the relevance of his opinion. Therefore, this portion of Defendant's motion is denied. (Reader, L)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/25/2010 ORDERING that the parties in this case have, to date, failed to comply with FRCP 5.2(a)(3) and Local Rule 140(a)(i), which require that only the minor plaintiff's initials be used in any electronic or paper filing. All future filings in this case shall comply with Federal Rule 5.2(a)(3) and Local Rule 140(a)(i). To comply with these rules, the caption of this case is amended, as reflected above. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Stevens
Represented By: Arthur Loyal Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?