Lee v. Custom Builders, a California Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Randal Lee
Defendant: Custom Builders and Frank Latronico
Case Number: 2:2008cv01909
Filed: August 15, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 8/13/10, per 38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, pltf's complaint is hereby DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 07/12/10 ORDERING that the Motion for Summary Adjudication Hearing is reset for 8/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.; pltf's response to motion due by 08/06/10; pltf's counsel shall show cause by 8/6/2010 why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $150.00 for failing to file a response to the motion. (Manzer, C)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/13/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for terminating sanctions to Compel discovery 22 is VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/10 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses & Request For Monetary Sanctions is withdrawn; the hearing date, of 2/3/10, is vacated; the Clerk is directed to terminate the motion; and the order to show cause issued on 12/31/09, is discharged. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Custom Builders, a California Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Lee
Represented By: J. Chauncey Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Latronico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?