Lopez Rodriguez, et al v. SGLC Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Fray Marcelino Lopez Rodriguez, Joel Gonzalez Avila, Juan Alonso Balon Marquez, Meliton Guzman Contreras, Dario Virgen Chavez, Cesar Hugo Ibarra Ceja, Abraham Jimenez Bueno, Jaime Lopez Ramos, Daniel Becerra Aguilar, Francisco Ceja Sandoval, Luis Ramon Naranjo Campos, Jorge Luis Pendon Silva, Nicolas Reyes Tiburcio, Aldo Manuel Rodriguez Zepeda, Sergio Aguirre Batista, Hugo Santiago Arredondo Huerta, Israel Blas Jimenez, Librado Blas Martinez, Ramiro Alejandro Garcia Castro, Enrique Garcia Michel, Angel Pano Ruiz, Frisdman Pena Ochoa, Octavio Revolledo Godinez and Agustin Torres Elias
Defendant: SGLC, INC., Salvador Gonzalez and Julian Gonzalez
Case Number: 2:2008cv01971
Filed: August 20, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/3/2015 ORDERING that pursuant to the parties' settlement and Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal, this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER ENTERING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 APPROVING the Settlement Agreement; DIRECTING the parties to file their stipulated dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days. (Michel, G.)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/20/2015 ORDERING that dispositional documents regarding the settlement in this matter between all Plaintiffs and Defendants Islands, Inc. and Thomas Hester be filed by 4/30/2015. (Michel, G.)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/12/2015 ORDERING that, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a), all Plaintiff(s), hereby DISMISS this action against SGLC, Inc., Salvador Gonzalez, DBA Salvador Gonzalez Farm Labor Contractor and Julian Gonzalez only, in its entirety, with prejudice, and with all parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, except otherwise provided in the Settlement Agreement filed with this court. (Zignago, K.)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/9/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' MOTION to Bifurcate 367 is GRANTED. Not later than five (5) days following the date this Order is electronically filed, the parties are directed to file a joint status report advising the Court as to how many days it is estimated they will need to try the Phase One issues. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/14: Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement 353 , is hereby GRANTED. This matter is hereby submitted on the briefs as oral argument would not be of material assistance to the Court, E.D. Cal. Local R. 230(g), and the hearing currently set for January 23, 2014, is VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/23/2013 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part plaintiffs' 339 Motion for Leave to submit evidence through representative testimony and modify Scheduling Order. Specifically, plaintiff's Request to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED to permit plaintiffs' instant Motion to be heard. Plaintiff's Request for Representative Testimony is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/21/13. Case number 2:13-cv-2270 is reassigned to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:13-cv-2270 MCE KJN. (Manzer, C)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/13 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is set for 12/10/13 at 09:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Becknal, R)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/25/13 ORDERING that Defendants Greene & Hemly and Douglas Hemly are DISMISSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER Approving Settlement Agreement Between All Plaintiffs and The Greene & Hemly Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/1/13. (Kastilahn, A)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/4/12 DISMISSING without prejudice the opt-in-plaintiffs; DENYING as MOOT 160 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING 275 Motion to Submit Evidence Through Representative Testimony and Modification of Scheduling Order. (Meuleman, A)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/15/2012 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 168 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Donati, J)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/07/12 ORDERING that 266 Vino Farms Inc.'s Ex Parte request for relief from the page limitations is DENIED; Vino Farms is not relieved from the Court's 264 08/23/12 Order directing Defendant Vino Farms to advise the Court as to which of its two remaining Motions for Summary Judgment it prefers to have the Court consider. Accordingly, no later than two (2) days following the date this Order is electronically filed, Vino Farms is directed to advise this Court in writing as to which of its two remaining Motions it prefers to have this Court consider. (Benson, A.)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/4/12 ORDERING the Court hereby continues the deadline for Plaintiffs and the Greene and Hemly Defendants to submit dispositional settlement documents for 30 days, from 8/30/12 to and including 10/1/12. (Becknal, R)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/24/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Testimony by Videoconferencing of Plaintiffs and Opt-ins at Trial 249 is DENIED without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/23/12 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING as moot 139 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiffs Armand o Z. Arias and Demetrio Montes Gaitan. Not later than 2 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Vino Farms is directed to advise the Court which of its 2 remaining Motions for Summary Judgment 160 and 168 it prefers to have the Court consider. Armando Zunigas Arias and Demetrio Montes Gaitan terminated. (Meuleman, A)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/31/12 ORDERING that pursuant to the foregoing stipulation entered into between all parties, through their counsel of record, and good cause showing: IT IS SO ORDERED that the hearing for Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Testimony By Videoconferencing of Plaintiffs and Opt-Ins at Trial is continued to August 23, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. (Becknal, R)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/13/12: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/15/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Bench Trial RESET for 1/14/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER 224 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/30/2012 modifying Scheduling Order. Defendants' Reply Briefs to plaintiffs' Oppositions must be filed no later than 6/7/2012. Hearing on Motions shall remain on 6/14/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). (Marciel, M)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/20/2012 GRANTING plaintiffs' 191 Ex Parte Application to modify Motions deadlines/hearings. Plaintiffs' Opposition to defendants' dispositive 154 160 161 164 168 Motions must be filed on or before 5/17/2012. Defendants' Reply Briefs to plaintiffs' Oppositions must be filed no later than 5/31/2012. Motions Hearing is CONTINUED to 6/14/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). (Marciel, M)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/9/12; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between all parties, through their counsel of record that a Settlement Conference shall take place with respect to this matter on May 2, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Gregory G. Hollows.(Matson, R)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 **DISREGARD-DUPLICATE ORDER**ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/15/11: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs may exceed the 10 deposition limit and take the four additional depositions of Jesus Yepez, Matthew Hemly, Julie Ball and the Fed. Rules Civ. Proc. 30(b)(6) deposition of the representative of Vino Farms, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the amended scheduling order is modified to allow Plaintiffs the opportunity to schedule and depose the aforementioned individuals and and complete all other necessary proceedings related to those depositions y no later than January 31, 2012.(Matson, R) Modified on 11/15/2011 (Matson, R).
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER SHORTENING TIME signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/14/2011 ORDERING that plaintiffs' 129 Motion to Exceed 10 Depositions and To Modify the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order may be served by means of electronic service to the a ttorney of each defendant no later than 4:00 p.m. on November 10, 2011; a copy of this Order Shortening Time must be served along with the Motion; the Court finds the issues have been sufficiently briefed, therefore no argument will be heard on this motion or the Motion to Exceed 10 Depositions; each defendant shall have until 5:00 p.m. on 12/1/2011 to serve and file a response to the Motion. (Waggoner, D)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/26/11 ORDERING Bench Trial reset for 10/1/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr., Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Joint Final Pretrial Statement due 7/19/12. Any evidentiary or procedural motions due 7/19/2012; oppositions filed by 7/26/12 and replies filed by 8/2/12. (Meuleman, A)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/01/10 ORDERING that the Pre-Trial Status Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 12/16/10 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Benson, A.)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/23/10 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 82 , 86 , 87 , 96 are DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/5/2010 GRANTING plaintiff's 52 Motion to Compel. Responsive documents and Supplemental Responses indicating which documents previously produced shall be provided no later than 2/12/2010. (Marciel, M)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/2/10 re 68 Stipulation to submit pending motions on briefs. (Owen, K)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/18/09 ORDERING that the discovery deadline is extended until 2/12/10. (Donati, J)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/21/09 re 38 ORDERING that Discovery ddl is EXTENDED to 1/4/2010. (Duong, D)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/5/09 ORDERING pltfs' Motion for Conditional Certification of a FLSA Collective Action, for Court-Authorized Notice, and for Disclosure of the Names and Addresses of Potential Opt-in pltfs 14 is GRANTED. (Carlos, K)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRERTRIAL (STATUS) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/20/09 ORDERING that Discovery ddl 11/12/2009; Designation of Expert Witnesses ddl 1/12/2010; Dispositive Motion Hearing ddl 3/12/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Settlement Conference SET before Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/30/2010 9:00am. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Duong, D) Modified on 1/21/2009 (Duong, D).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Rodriguez, et al v. SGLC Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fray Marcelino Lopez Rodriguez
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Gonzalez Avila
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Alonso Balon Marquez
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliton Guzman Contreras
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Virgen Chavez
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Hugo Ibarra Ceja
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Jimenez Bueno
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Lopez Ramos
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Becerra Aguilar
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ceja Sandoval
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramon Naranjo Campos
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Pendon Silva
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Reyes Tiburcio
Represented By: Julia Louise Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Manuel Rodriguez Zepeda
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Aguirre Batista
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Santiago Arredondo Huerta
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Blas Jimenez
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Librado Blas Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Alejandro Garcia Castro
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Garcia Michel
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Pano Ruiz
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisdman Pena Ochoa
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Revolledo Godinez
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Torres Elias
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGLC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?