Nguyen v. Felker
Petitioner: Sutter Nguyen
Respondent: T. Felker
Case Number: 2:2008cv02150
Filed: September 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr on 2/2/15 GRANTING Certificate of Appealability. (Manzer, C)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. on 12/20/2012 DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Michel, G)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/19/10 denying 23 Motion to file an amended reply. (Plummer, M)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/22/09. (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/14/09 ORDERING that respondent's 2/10/09 17 request is GRANTED and the answer is deemed timely filed. (Gaydosh, J)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/28/2009 GRANTING 15 Respondent's request for an extension of time to respond to petition; Respondent has 20 days from the date this order is served to file and serve a response to the petition. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sutter Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?