Miskam v. McAllistr et al
Plaintiff: Travis George Miskam
Defendant: S McAllistr, N. Grannis, M. Keating, D Davey, M.D. McDonald, R. Pimentel, K.J. Allen, R.L. Gower, T Mossinger, M Brodderick and T. Felker
Case Number: 2:2008cv02229
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 4/20/2011 GRANTING Dfts' 61 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING Pltf's Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to close the case file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 1/10/2011 DENYING 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Further Discovery Responses. The court further sets the following deadlines for Defendants' 61 Motion for Summary Judgment and plt f's 60 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part dfts Motion for Summary Judgment: pltf shall file an Opposition to dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment by 2/11/2011, and dfts shall file a Reply to the Motion for Summary Judgment, as well as an Opposition to the Motion for Reconsideration by 2/25/2011. Unless otherwise notified, the court will determine this Motion for Summary Judgment without a hearing. (Reader, L)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 12/1/10 ORDERING Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2011 at 09:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge J. Michael Seabright and Jury Trial set for 7/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge J. Michael Seabright. (Carlos, K)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 11/29/10 DENYING 56 Motion for Reconsideration. (Williams, D)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 11/16/2010 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Travis George Miskam (CDC # K-43612) via telephonic conference on 12/1/2010 at 9:00 AM (Hawaii time) before Judge Seabright. Custodian order to notify Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian w/copy of Writ. Clerk shall serve copy of Order & Writ on Warden. (cc: IT Dept - Sacramento) (Marciel, M)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 10/26/10 ORDERING all pretrial proceedings will be conducted by telecommunications technologies; jury trial is set before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright on 3/15/11 at 9:00 AM; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 AM on 2/15/11 before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright; pltf's non-expert witness list due by 11/22/10; dfts due 11/29/10; discovery deadline is 12/20/10; and this order shall continue in effect unless and until amended by subsequent order of the court. (Carlos, K)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 10/12/2010. Plantiff's 41 Motion to Compel is GRANTED to the extent it seeks a Response from defendants on Discovery requests. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's Requests by 10/29/2010. Court also DENIES the Motion to the extent it seeks substantive sanctions against defendants. (Marciel, M)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 9/21/10 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Captain Davey and Warden Felker Remain. (Donati, J)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 2/19/2010 ORDERING that the parties are notified that all pretrial proceedings will be conducted by telecommunications technologies to allow plaintiff to remain in the penal in stitution. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/14/2010; Discovery due by 3/29/2010; Motions filed by 5/17/2010; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2010 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 10/19/2010 at 09:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge J. Michael Seabright. The parties shall be on call for a settlement conference before the HonorableJ. Michael Seabright, United States District Judge. (Matson, R)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING USM'S 17 REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 01/04/10 ORDERING that dfts N. Grannis, K.J. Allen, and R. Pimentel to each reimburse the U.S. Marshal Service for $85.82, for a total of $257.46. (cc: USM). (Benson, A.)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge J. Michael Seabright on 08/20/09 DIRECTING USM to serve * Complaint * filed on * 09/22/08,* on * T Mossinger, T. Felker, S McAllistr, N. Grannis, M. Keating, D Davey, M.D. McDonald, R. Pimentel, K.J. Allen, R.L. Gower*. Clerk is directed to serve the Local Rules of Court on the Plaintiff. (cc USM Priority) Service Deadline set for 12/22/2009. (Streeter, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miskam v. McAllistr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis George Miskam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S McAllistr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Mossinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Brodderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?