Andrea Van Scoy, etal v. New Albertson's, Inc., etal
Plaintiff: Andrea Van Scoy, Lynda Azevedo, Diana Murdock, Christina Carnes, Mina Jo Guerrero, Miracle Johnson, Rosanne Lazuka, Patricia Logan, Teresa Lyon, Theresa Orth and Mara Grace Smith
Defendant: New Albertson's, Inc., Albertson's Inc., Save-Mart Supermarkets, Inc. and Lucky's Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02237
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/8/13: This case is dismissed with prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/3/12 ORDERING Plaintiff's Request for Augmentation is accordingly DENIED, and its concurrent Objection to the FPTO (as both set forth in ECF No. 194) is OVERRULED. (Matson, R)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/8/11: The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/17/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The parties shall file, not later than 4/26/2012, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 5/3/2012. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 4/26/2012. Oppositions must be filed by 5/3/2012, and any reply must be filed by 5/10/2012. The Jury Trial is SET for 7/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/28/2011 ORDERING that Defendant has not established as a matter of law that Plaintiffs claims, as set forth in their First Cause of Action, are barred by the applicable statute of limitations. Since Defendant must necessarily make that showing in order to prevail pursuant to the terms of their motions, Defendants 128 130 Motions for Summary Judgment are hereby DENIED.(Duong, D)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/11 ORDERING that the hearings as to 130 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and 128 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT are RESET for 6/9/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief, must be filed no later than 5/19/11. Defendants' reply brief due by 6/2/11. (Donati, J)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/18/11 ORDERING Pltfs' motion to reopen discovery completion deadline 121 is DENIED. (Carlos, K) Modified on 3/22/2011 (Carlos, K).
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/8/11 ORDERING that the Motion for Certificate of Appealability 94 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/24/11: The court's order requiring the parties to show cause is discharged 112 . Defendants' motion for protective order and motion to quash will be held in abeyance. The hearing on defendants' motions is vacated, subject to re-noticing by defendants. (Kaminski, H)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/11: The parties shall meet and confer regarding the pending discovery dispute and file, no later than January 21, 2011, either: a Joint Statement or a statement summarizing the parties' good faith efforts to meet and confer. On or before January 24, 2011, plaintiffs and defendants shall each file a brief. The parties shall also show cause, in writing, on or before January 24, 2011, why defendants' motions should not be held in abeyance pending Judge England's resolution of a request or motion to modify the existing Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order. The hearing presently set for January 27, 2011, shall remain on calendar. (Kaminski, H)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/10/2010. Court DECLINES to grant requested terminating sanctions, and will further refrain from any award of attorney's fees at this time. The 84 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED to that exten t. The 84 Motion will be GRANTED in part, however, given that the Court will issue an Order compelling Discovery as requested by defendant. Plaintiff Miracle Johnson is hereby ORDERED to make herself available for deposition w/in 30 days following date of this Order. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to provide responses to all outstanding Requests for written Discovery no later than one week before her deposition is scheduled. Court will reassess issue of sanctions should Johnson fail to appear for deposition and/or provide requisite Discovery responses. (Marciel, M)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/30/2010 ORDERING 32 Motion for Summary Judgment and 39 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED. (Matson, R)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/30/10: HEARING as to 39 Motion for Summary Judgment RESET for 9/30/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Kaminski, H)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/18/10 ORDERING that the hearing on dft's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Christina Carnes is CONTINUED to 09/30/10 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Plf's opposition is due 09/16/10; dft's reply is due 09/23/10. (Benson, A.)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/5/2010 re: 29 Stipulation. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/28/2010, Discovery due by 12/31/2010, Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 3/21/2010, Last Day for Hearing Dispositive Motions is 4/29/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trail dates will remain the same as previously established. (Waggoner, D)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/9/10 ORDERING that pursuant to stipulation, the claims of pltf Mara Grace Smith against deft Save Mart Supermarkets, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. (Owen, K)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/07/10 ORDERING that the parties' 23 Stipulated Protective Order is NOT approved. (Benson, A.)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/30/10 GRANTING Deft's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Pltf Teresa Lyon. The claims of the other named Pltfs remain active and may proceed. (Owen, K)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/10/2010 ORDERING the Court hereby grants the parties' request and modifies the current pre-trial scheduling order as follows: Discovery due by 8/2/2010; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/8/2010; and motions for Summary Judgment filed by 11/1/2010. (Matson, R)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/20/09 ORDERING discovery to be completed by 4/14/10; disclosure of expert witnesses to be filed not later than 6/14/10; dispositive motions shall be heard no later than 8/13/10; f inal pretrial conference set for 12/16/10 2:00 PM before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. in Courtroom 7; parties shall file trial briefs not later than 12/2/10 by 4:00 PM; jury trial set for 2/14/11 at 9:00 AM before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. in Courtroom 7 and this status order will become final without further order of the court unless objetions are filed within 7 court days of service of this order. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrea Van Scoy, etal v. New Albertson's, Inc., etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Van Scoy
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Azevedo
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Murdock
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Carnes
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Jo Guerrero
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miracle Johnson
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne Lazuka
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Logan
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lyon
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Orth
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara Grace Smith
Represented By: Jill Elizabeth Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Albertson's, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ames Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ames Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save-Mart Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ames Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky's Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ames Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?